Green et al v. Vogelsang et al
Plaintiff: Dan Green and Tangilia S Green
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Richard Vogelsang, Clear Blue Insurance Company, Progressive Domestic Insurance Company and Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02200
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorneys John D. Sileo and Casey William Moll for Dan Green, Tangilia S Green. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 29, 2020. (mp)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Dan Green and Tangilia S. Green, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Richard Vogelsang and by Clear Blue Insurance Company (Truong, Olivia)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Sileo, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Dan Green, Tangilia S Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Dan Green(pty:pla), Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Tangilia S Green(pty:pla).(Sileo, John)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, OCTOBER 6, 2020 at 9:45 A.M. Counsel shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 14, 2020.(mp)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/6/2020 09:45 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 12/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Case Manager. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(NEF: Mag. Judge)(mp)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Conference by Telephone set for 9/15/2020 09:30 AM before the Case Manager. Call-in instructions provided herein. Signed by Case Manager. (mp)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/20/2020. (NEF: Section I)(sbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Advantage Insurance Company (Buras, Floyd) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (sbs).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Richard Vogelsang.Attorney Floyd Anthony Buras, III added to party Richard Vogelsang(pty:dft).(Buras, Floyd) Modified text, added link on 8/20/2020 (sbs).
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Clear Blue Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Clear Blue Financial Holdings LLC for Clear Blue Insurance Company (Truong, Olivia)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Clear Blue Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Truong, Olivia) Modified text, added link on 8/13/2020 (sbs).
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. (lt)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-5586 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8435772) filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B- Citations on Defendants, #3 Exhibit C- Other State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D- List of Parties, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Olivia Y. Truong added to party Clear Blue Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Truong, Olivia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Vogelsang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Floyd Anthony Buras, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Vogelsang
Represented By: Floyd Anthony Buras, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Blue Insurance Company
Represented By: Olivia Y. Truong
Represented By: Richard E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Domestic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittany M. Courtenay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Green
Represented By: Ford Thomas Hardy, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Sileo
Represented By: Casey William Moll
Represented By: Amber Eldridge Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangilia S Green
Represented By: Ford Thomas Hardy, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Sileo
Represented By: Casey William Moll
Represented By: Amber Eldridge Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?