de Oleo v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Aulalia de Oleo
Defendant: Demarcus Lorenzo Gordon, JHG Logistics, LLC, Budget Truck Rental, LLC, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Protective Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02212
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. The above-captioned matter is REMANDED to the Twenty Fourth Judicial District Court for the Parish of Jefferson, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 28, 2020. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2020: #1 Remand Letter) (mp).
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION by Aulalia de Oleo and FedEx Ground Package and Protective Insurance Company (Brigandi, Peter)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Aulalia de Oleo re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . (mp)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERD that the #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 23, 2020. (mp)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/23/2020. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff Aulalia de Oleoa shall advise the Court by FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 25, 2020 at 4:00 PM as to whether de Oeo consents to enter into a stipulation not to execute on any judgment beyond $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs, if defendants agree not to oppose de Oleo's motion for remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for defendants to amend their pleadings is extended to FRIDAY, OCTOBER 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (mp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct, MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, MOTION for Leave to File reply to remand. Not necessary to select relief(s) Motion to Amend/Correct and/or Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis for this document. Only the relief Motion for Leave to File Document is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary. (mp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File reply to remand by Aulalia de Oleo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Brigandi, Peter) Modified text/event(s) on 9/23/2020 (mp).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/23/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/22/2020.(blg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Protective Insurance Company re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Jaynes, Megan)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court shall be set for submission on SEPTEMBER 30, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any response shall by filed no later than SEPTEMBER 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on September 8, 2020.(mp)
September 6, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Aulalia de Oleo. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Brigandi, Peter)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on TUESDAY, OCTOBER 6, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. Counsel shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on August 27, 2020.(mp)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 12/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Case Manager. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(NEF: Mag. Judge)(mp)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: A Preliminary Conference by Telephone is set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM before the Case Manager. Call-in instructions provided herein. Signed by Case Manager. (mp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance (List of Pleadings) by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Protective Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Jaynes, Megan) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bm).
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance (List of Parties) by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Protective Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Jaynes, Megan) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bm).
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court Parish of Jefferson, case number 802-003 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8437943) filed by Protective Insurance Company, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Megan T. Jaynes, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit "A" - Citation and Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit "B" - JHG Acquiescence, #6 Exhibit "C" Budget Rental Acquiescence, #7 Exhibit "D" Magnolia MRIs, #8 Exhibit "E River Bend Imaging, #9 Exhibit "F" - Dr Kruse Report - injections, #10 Exhibit "G" - Bartholomew Injections Referral, #11 Exhibit "H" - 12-3-19 FU Dr. Kruse - de Oleo, #12 Exhibit "I" 1-14-20 Dr Kruse, #13 Exhibit "J" - Protective Insurance entity information, #14 Exhibit "K" - FedEx Ground entity information, #15 Exhibit "L" - JHG Logistics LLC)Attorney Megan T Jaynes added to party FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Megan T Jaynes added to party Protective Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jaynes, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Oleo v. Protective Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demarcus Lorenzo Gordon
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHG Logistics, LLC
Represented By: P. M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Truck Rental, LLC
Represented By: Caroline D. Elliott
Represented By: Stephen N. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Megan T Jaynes
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Represented By: Julie Lafargue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan T Jaynes
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Represented By: Julie Lafargue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aulalia de Oleo
Represented By: Peter Ralph Brigandi
Represented By: Kyle M. Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?