Michael et al v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Karla Pizzati and Angel Michael
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, Altra Running, Steven Kellett, Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company, VF Corporation, USAA General Indemnity Company, Altra Corporation and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02214
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Scheduling Conference was held on 09/23/2020. All discovery must be completed by 6/11/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(am)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Enroll Jessica Victoria Hidalgo as Counsel of Record for Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/18/2020. (clc)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Jessica V. Hidalgo by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Nieset, James) Modified text on 9/18/2020 (am).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: GRANTING #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John Caire Wegmann for Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/01/2020. (am)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record John C. Wegmann. **Documents on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (am)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 7 to document 1. (bm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record John C. Wegmann by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Nieset, James) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (am). (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/1/2020) (am).
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with Jury Demand by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Nieset, James) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should thedocument you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 5 to document 1. (lt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ACE American Insurance Company, Altra Running, Steven Kellett, VF Corporation.(Schexnaydre, David) Modified on 8/26/2020 (lt).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by ACE American Insurance Company, Altra Running, Steven Kellett, VF Corporation re #3 Order. (Schexnaydre, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Altra Running, Steven Kellett, VF Corporation, and ACE American Insurance Company. (pp)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
August 10, 2020 Filing fee received from David Schexnayder Receipt No.-LAE063209: $ 400.00 (go)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-5528 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Steven Kellett, ACE American Insurance Company, Altra Running, VF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Redacted Medical Records, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit List of All Parties, #6 Exhibit Verification)Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Altra Running(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Steven Kellett(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party VF Corporation(pty:dft).(Schexnaydre, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/11/2020) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael et al v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Represented By: Mary Bowman Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altra Running
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Represented By: Mary Bowman Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kellett
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Represented By: Mary Bowman Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Caire Wegmann
Represented By: James R. Nieset, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Victoria Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Corporation
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Represented By: Mary Bowman Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altra Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Pizzati
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Michael
Represented By: Dominick F. Impastato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?