Jeral v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Shawn Jeral
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02222
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Certificate of Service. **1.Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION to substitute counsel. 2. This document is a duplicate of document 5, and will be noted as such. 3. Document does not contain District Judge and Magistrate Judge information. All future pleadings must reflect Section D Judge Wendy B. Vitter and Magistrate 1 Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld.** (jeg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 **ERROR- See Correct document rec doc 5** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shawn Jeral for plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cade, Melvin) Modified on 8/17/2020 (jeg).
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Withdraw Louis Gerdes as Attorney for plaintiff, First MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Melvin N. Cade by Shawn Jeral. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Melvin N. Cade, Sr added to party Shawn Jeral(pty:pla).(Cade, Melvin) Modified on 8/17/2020 (jeg).
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record b by Shawn Jeral. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Melvin N. Cade, Sr added to party Shawn Jeral(pty:pla).(Cade, Melvin) Modified on 8/14/2020 (jeg).
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bm)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8442062) filed by Shawn Jeral. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Louis Adam Gerdes, Jr added to party Shawn Jeral(pty:pla).(Gerdes, Louis) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/12/2020) (bm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/12/2020) (bm). Modified on 8/12/2020 (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeral v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Jeral
Represented By: Louis Adam Gerdes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?