Marchand v Hoskins et al
Plaintiff: Paul Marchand and Paul Marchand, III
Defendant: Darrell Hoskins, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company and Travelers Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02224
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Kelly, Hilliard) Modified on 9/3/2020 (lt).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Response to Order to Show Cause. **Document has been marked as filed in error. See rec. doc. 7 for the corrected filing.** (jls)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Travelers citizenship, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's discovery responses)(Kelly, Hilliard) Modified text on 8/27/2020 (jls).
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR - See rec. doc. 7 for corrected filing** RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Indian Harbor Insurance Company re 4 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Travelers' citizenship, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's discovery response)(Kelly, Hilliard) Modified text on 8/27/2020 (jls).
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Indian Harbor Insurance Company pursuant to #3 Directive. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages)(Kelly, Hilliard) Modified text/linkage on 8/25/2020 (jls).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company submit summary-judgment-type evidence regarding the amount in controversy at the time of removal to the Court within fourteen days of the date of this Order, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company allege the citizenship of Defendant Travelers Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/13/2020.(jls)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(lt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-2774 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8442658) filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Accident Report, #4 Exhibit MFBCIC Domicile info, #5 Exhibit IHIC Domicile info, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)Attorney Hilliard F. Kelly, III added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:selreq).(Kelly, Hilliard) Modified on 8/12/2020 (lt). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/12/2020) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchand v Hoskins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Hilliard F. Kelly, III
Represented By: Lauren Fajoni Bartlett
Represented By: Barbara L. Bossetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Marchand, III
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?