Drummond v James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Andrea Drummond
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02226
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Andrea Drummond. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission. (Rieth, Kevin) Modified submission date and text on 9/14/2020 (cg).
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: First MOTION to Remand Kevin A. Rieth by Andrea Drummond. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A/ Stipulation)(Rieth, Kevin) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cg).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pierre F. Gaudin shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/26/20. (cg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Withdraw Pierre F. Gaudin as Attorney Kevin A. Rieth by Andrea Drummond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rieth, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent that were listed in the document at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action and add corporate parents. (cg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Corporate Parents identified as James River Group, Inc. and James River Group Holdings, Ltd., by James River Insurance Company (Cisco, Colin) Modified corporate parents on 8/24/2020 (cg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Service Documents)(Cisco, Colin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b): re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James River Insurance Company. (lt)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Colin C. Cisco . (Cisco, Colin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from CDC for Orleans Parish, case number 2020-00300 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8442830) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Email with Counsel, #4 Exhibit Redacted Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit Redacted Medicals, #6 Service Copy)Attorney Colin C. Cisco added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:mov).(Cisco, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Drummond
Represented By: Pierre F. Gaudin
Represented By: Kevin A Rieth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin C. Cisco
Represented By: Randall C. Mulcahy
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?