Riha v. Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Plaintiff: James Riha
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, LLC, Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc. and Nautical Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02234
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #8 Amended Complaint by Nautical Solutions LLC.Attorney Colin B. Cambre added to party Nautical Solutions LLC(pty:dft).(Cambre, Colin) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (am).
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nautical Solutions, LLC. (am)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nautical Solutions, LLC filed by James Riha.(am)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/24/2020. (am)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by James Riha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Young, Timothy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by James Riha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading)(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (am).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Offshore Service Vessels, LLC served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Young, Timothy)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Offshore Service Vessels, LLC. (lt)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Offshore Service Vessels, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8444000) filed by James Riha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Megan C Misko added to party James Riha(pty:pla).(Misko, Megan) Modified on 8/13/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riha v. Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Riha
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Taylor Michael Bologna
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Michael J. Yenni, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?