Laurent v. Avondale Industries Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dennis J Laurent
Defendant: CBS Corporation, McCarty Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Avondale Industries, Inc., Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Viacom Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Commercial Union Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company and Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, LP, General Electric Company, The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, ViacomCBS Inc, Bayer CropScience, Benjamin Foster Co, Amchem Products, Inc., Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust and Foster Wheeler, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02239
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Sanctions by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers). Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Notice of Submission)(Melancon, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler, LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler, LLC (Eagan, Kelsey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and Cross-claim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler, LLC.Attorney Kelsey A. Eagan added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC(pty:3pd).(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (lt).
September 24, 2020 Filing 52 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
September 24, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Laura Ashleigh Leggette for Lamorak Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/18/2020. (cwa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alex Tyler Robertson terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/18/2020. (cwa)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as alleged insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., be and hereby is granted an extension of time, through and including October 23, 2020, within which to respond to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross Claim. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/18/2020. (cwa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 47 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Viacom, Inc., ViacomCBS, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Eagan, Kelsey) Modified corporate parents on 9/21/2020 (cg).
September 18, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 CROSS CLAIM and THIRD PARTY DEMANDS of Huntington Ingalls by ViacomCBS Inc. Attorney Kelsey A. Eagan added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:crd).(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 45 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Eagan, Kelsey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 CROSS CLAIM AND THIRD PARTY DEMANDS of Huntington Ingalls Inc. by General Electric Company. Attorney Kelsey A. Eagan added to party General Electric Company(pty:3pd).(Eagan, Kelsey) Modified on 9/21/2020 (bm).
September 18, 2020 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Laura Leggette by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Alex T. Robertson as Attorney by Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Uniroyal Holding, Inc..Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 40 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #34 #35 #36 #37 Request for Summons Issued. Filing attorney incorrectly linked documents 34, 35, 36, and 37 to document 9. Clerk properly linked document 34, 35, 36, and 37 to document 1. (bm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing), Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(bm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing). Attorney H. Minor Pipes, III added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Pipes, H.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 37 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Gillen, Laura) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bm).
September 16, 2020 Filing 36 Request of Summons Issued as to General Electric Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Gillen, Laura) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bm).
September 16, 2020 Filing 35 Request of Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler, LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Gillen, Laura) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bm).
September 16, 2020 Filing 34 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Gillen, Laura) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bm).
September 15, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Avondale's Cross-Claims and Third-Party Demands by Bayer CropScience.Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Bayer CropScience(pty:3pd).(St. Julien, Milele)
September 15, 2020 Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience (St. Julien, Milele)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers), in Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand of #22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplement MIS Motion Remand R. Doc 28. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 28 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Dennis J Laurent, in Support of #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(cwa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Avondale Interests may file a supplemental opposition no later than September 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/2/2020. (cwa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers), Lamorak Insurance Company re #22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplement MIS Motion Remand . (Melancon, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers), Lamorak Insurance Company re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Melancon, David)
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement MIS Motion Remand. This is a consent motion as it is decided by the Judge. This motion is not set for submission and the submission date has been removed. No further action is needed. (cg)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplement MIS Motion Remand by Dennis J Laurent. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Philip) Modified submission date and text on 9/1/2020 (cg).
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Semmes, Mathilde)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 *DEFICIENT* Supplemental Memorandum filed by Dennis J Laurent, in In Support of #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Philip) Modified on 9/1/2020 (cg).
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Mathilde Villere Semmes added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Semmes, Mathilde)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Semmes, Mathilde)
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dennis J Laurent. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Philip)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, CBS Corporation, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Manville, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(cg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 Request of Summons Issued as to Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Gillen, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Gillen, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Gillen, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to Hopeman Brothers filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Gillen, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Gillen, Laura)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Francis Christopher Cannone for Lamorak Insurance Company. Attorney Adam Devlin deMahy terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/14/2020. (cwa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Petition for Damages by Lamorak Insurance Company.(Rosamond, Samuel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Francis C. Connone to be substituted in place of Adam D. deMahy by Lamorak Insurance Company(as the Liability Insurers of Avondale Executive Officers). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Samuel Milton Rosamond, III added to party Lamorak Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rosamond, Samuel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Avondale Industries, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-5159 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8444248) filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurent v. Avondale Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: James R Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelsey L. Meeks
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Casualty & Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Laura Ashleigh Leggette
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer Cropscience, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer CropScience
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Benjamin Foster Co
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J Laurent
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?