Byrd et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Byrd and Stephen Byrd
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Inc and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02278
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zoha Barkeshli terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/24/2020. (cwa)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Zoha Barkeshli as Attorney by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (cwa).
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Zoha Barkeshli as Attorney of Record by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified on 9/21/2020 (cwa).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Zoha Barkeshli petition the court for admission, substitution or withdrawal of counsel on or before October 16, 2020, or show cause on that date by written memorandum why sanctions, including removal from this case, should not be imposed for failure to comply with Court directives. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/18/2020. (1 cc: to Zoha Barkeshli via email & US Mail) (sa)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Celeste R. Coco-Ewing and Janelle E. Sharer are substituted in place of Jessica L. Brennan and Susan M. Sharko, as counsel for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/15/2020. (sa)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney . Attorneys Celeste R. Coco-Ewing and Janelle E. Sharer to be substituted in place of Susan M. Sharko and Jessica L. Brennan by DePuy Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Celeste R. Coco-Ewing added to party DePuy Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste R. Coco-Ewing added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste R. Coco-Ewing added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Celeste R. Coco-Ewing added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Coco-Ewing, Celeste) Modified text/event on 9/15/2020 (cwa).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Susan M. Sharko petition the court for admission, substitution or withdrawal of counsel on or before October 12, 2020, or show cause on that date by written memorandum why sanctions, including removal from this case, should not be imposed for failure to comply with Court directives. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2020. (1 cc: Ms. Sharko via e-mail and US Mail) (sa)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Jessica L. Brennan petition the court for admission, substitution or withdrawal of counsel on or before October 12, 2020, or show cause on that date by written memorandum why sanctions, including removal from this case, should not be imposed for failure to comply with Court directives. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2020. (1 cc: Ms. Brennan via e-mail & US Mail) (sa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:11-dp-21141. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
August 17, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana on 8/17/20 (P,R) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Termination of case (P,R) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order denying Defendants' Motion to dismiss (Related Doc #2 ) and Amended Motion to dismiss (Related Doc #3 ). Case transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/17/20.(P,R) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Amended Motion to dismiss filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Letters, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sharko, Susan) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to dismiss filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sharko, Susan) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
September 13, 2016 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick (MDL 2197) assigned to case. David A. Katz (MDL2197) removed from case. (D,M) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
September 6, 2016 Notice [non-document] of case reassignment to Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick pursuant to the Order of Reassignment in master docket, 1:10-md-2197, Doc. No., 1079. (R,Sh) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]
July 12, 2011 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against all Defendants. Filing fee paid. Receipt # 14660046060. Filed by Pamela Byrd, Stephen Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (K,V) [Transferred from ohnd on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Byrd
Represented By: Robert John Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Byrd
Represented By: Robert John Young, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Lauren D. Godfrey
Represented By: Deirdre R. Kole
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Lauren D. Godfrey
Represented By: Deirdre R. Kole
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Lauren D. Godfrey
Represented By: Deirdre R. Kole
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Jessica L. Brennan
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Lauren D. Godfrey
Represented By: Deirdre R. Kole
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?