Craigie v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Albert Craige and Daniel Albert Craigie
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02279
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Receipt of Transfer Case to District of New Jersey (pp)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2875. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(bm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2875. (bm)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siegel, Kyle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (ajn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Siegel, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC for the Parish of St. Tammany, case number 2020-12813 Div. "J"(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8452126) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Removal)Attorney Kyle W. Siegel added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft).(Siegel, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigie v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle W. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Kyle W. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Albert Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Albert Craigie
Represented By: James E. Cazalot, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Marvin Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?