Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC
Defendant: CMG Pepper, LLC and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02280
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(jeg)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/29/2020. (jeg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (jeg)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/29/2020. (jeg)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Lowe, Amy) Modified text/exparte on 9/29/2020 (jeg).
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Ralston, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ralston, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Lowe, Amy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. as corporate parent for CMG Pepper, LLC t the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. for CMG Pepper, LLC (Lowe, Amy) Modified text/corporate parents on 9/16/2020 (jeg).
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Amy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Statement, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Proposed Order)Attorney Amy Groves Lowe added to party CMG Pepper, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Groves Lowe added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lowe, Amy) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jeg).
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Submission)(Ralston, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Executed. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Affidavit of Service. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service as to CMG Pepper, LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Calhoun, Lindsay) Modified text/event on 9/10/2020 (jeg).
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Calhoun, Lindsay)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CMG Pepper, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued, #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney uploaded complaint with incorrect Court Caption. Corrected complaint subsequently provided to Clerk, and image has been swapped. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark (jeg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to CMG Pepper, LLC filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Ralston, Christopher) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/19/2020) (jeg).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Ralston, Christopher) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/19/2020) (jeg).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8452226) filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher K. Ralston added to party Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC(pty:pla).(Ralston, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/18/2020) (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC
Represented By: Christopher K. Ralston
Represented By: Warner Joseph Delaune, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMG Pepper, LLC
Represented By: Amy Groves Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Groves Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?