Alexis et al v. Hilcorp Energy Company et al
Plaintiff: Cecele Alexis and Gleason Alexis
Defendant: Bonvillian Marine Service, Inc., Hot Energy Services, Inc. and Hilcorp Energy Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02289
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING #11 Motion to Remand to State Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (am)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 5/7/2021. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 10/5/2020.(clc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2020: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (sa).
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Hilcorp Energy Company re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Isenberg, Craig)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cecele Alexis. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Garside, Clay)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2020 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Bonvillian Marine Service, Inc.(Wilson, Andrew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Hot Energy Services, Inc..(Asprodites, Rowen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Answer to Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (am)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hilcorp Energy Company.(Isenberg, Craig) Modified text/linkage on 8/25/2020 (am).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hilcorp Energy Company (Isenberg, Craig)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by Hilcorp Energy Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Isenberg, Craig)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 25th JDC Parish of Plaquemines, case number 66069 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8454682) filed by Hilcorp Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #5 Proposed Pleading Notice to Adverse Party of Removal)Attorney Craig Isenberg added to party Hilcorp Energy Company(pty:dft).(Isenberg, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis et al v. Hilcorp Energy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonvillian Marine Service, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Bowlin
Represented By: Andrew C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rowen Fricker Asprodites
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Company
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecele Alexis
Represented By: Clay Joseph Garside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gleason Alexis
Represented By: Clay Joseph Garside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?