Ferrand v. Fuller et al
Plaintiff: Deverick C. Ferrand
Defendant: Ryan Arceneaux, Tyler Goings, Nathan Rome, Demetrius Smith and Melissa Fuller
Case Number: 2:2020cv02293
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ryan Arceneaux, Melissa Fuller, Tyler Goings, Nathan Rome, Demetrius Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons Nathan Rome, #2 Summons Tyler Goings, #3 Summons Ryan Arceneaux, #4 Summons Demetrius Smith)(dw) (cc: USM w/ Pauper Order and Complaint)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $0 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to DEVERICK CHARLES FERRAND, 321519 in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/19/2020.(dw) (NEF: Financial, cc: Warden)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deverick C. Ferrand. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing) (Cures Deficiency)(ajn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/9/2020. (ajn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deverick C. Ferrand. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (ajn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Deverick C. Ferrand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrand v. Fuller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Arceneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrius Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deverick C. Ferrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?