Morrison v. CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Morrison
Defendant: Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC, CLK Multifamily Management, LLC, CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC, Unidentified Parties and Melina Marque
Case Number: 2:2020cv02299
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (sbs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC, Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 First Amended Complaint as to CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC and Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC answer due 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/29/2020. (sbs)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #12 First Amended Complaint by CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC, Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (sbs).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/23/2020. (sbs)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Frankie Morrison re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Offner, Kurt)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Melina Marque. (sbs)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC, Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC, Melina Marque filed by Frankie Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(sbs)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 9/18/2020. (sbs)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Frankie Morrison. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Offner, Kurt) Modified text, added submission date and set for submission on 9/18/2020 (sbs).
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Frankie Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit)(Offner, Kurt) Modified event and text on 9/17/2020 (sbs). (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/17/2020) (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #4 Proposed Pleading Complaint, #5 Proposed Order) (sbs).
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Anada, Tarak) **Motion terminated. R. Doc. 12 moots this motion. 9/21/20** Modified on 9/23/2020 (sbs).
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC, Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Anada, Tarak) Modified text and link on 8/24/2020 (sbs).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC, CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Anada, Tarak) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (sbs).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Medical Records Exhibit Under Seal re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/20/2020. (sbs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC, CLK Multifamily Management, LLC. By the Clerk.(sbs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (sek)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Medical Records Exhibit Under Seal re #1 Notice of Removal, by CLK Multifamily Management, LLC, Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #2 Medical Records - Part 1, #3 Medical Records - Part 2, #4 Medical Records - Part 3, #5 Medical Records - Part 4) (sbs). Modified text on 8/24/2020 (sbs).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Jefferson Parish, case number 807-060 "N" (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8456286) filed by Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC, CLK Multifamily Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)Attorney Tarak Anada added to party CLK Multifamily Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tarak Anada added to party Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC(pty:dft).(Anada, Tarak) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #5 Medical Records - Part 1, #6 Medical Records - Part 2, #7 Medical Records - Part 3, #8 Medical Records - Part 4) (sbs). Modified text on 8/24/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coolidge-CLK St. Germaine, LLC
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLK Multifamily Management, LLC
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLK Multi-Family Management, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Wicker, IV
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melina Marque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Morrison
Represented By: John Michael Zazulak
Represented By: John Bartholomew Kelly, III
Represented By: Ellen Kerstin Baggett
Represented By: Kurt A. Offner
Represented By: Craig S. Leydecker
Represented By: Jeanne K. Demarest
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Jennifer Kuechmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?