LeBouef v. Ochsner Main Hospital
Plaintiff: Tony J LeBouef
Defendant: Ochsner Main Hospital
Case Number: 2:2020cv02300
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Response to Deficiency Notice by Tony J LeBouef (am)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Tony J LeBouef, it is recommended that Plaintiffs suit be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Objections to R&R due by 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/27/2020.(caa)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAUPER ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $5.83 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to TONY J. LEBOUEF, #8358282 in monthly payments as set out in document. The CLERK is instructed to REMOVE the deficiency from the complaint at Rec. Doc. #1 . The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/24/2020. (NEF: Financial, cc: Sheriff) (dw) Modified text on 8/25/2020 (dw).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/11/2020. (mm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony J LeBouef. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (mm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Ochsner Main Hospital filed by Tony J LeBouef. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBouef v. Ochsner Main Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony J LeBouef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Main Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?