Bouchgl et al v. Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO et al
Plaintiff: Aicha Bouchgl and Suleiman Ibrahim
Defendant: Julie Greem, Louisiana State Dep of Justice, Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO, Attorney General State of Louisiana, Creekwood Elmwood, Bellawood Apartments Home, Department of Justice Louisiana State and Tonti Properties
Case Number: 2:2020cv02302
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman Ibrahim re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (mm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. **Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 10/21/2020. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Attorney General State of Louisiana. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Griffon, Kade) Modified text/submission date on 10/1/2020 (mm).
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General State of Louisiana served on 9/21/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Bellawood Apartments Home served on (No Date Provided); Creekwood Elmwood served on (No Date Provided); Tonti Properties served on (No Date Provided). (mm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman Ibrahim re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (mm)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Attorney General State of Louisiana. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Housing Discrimination Complaint, #2 Exhibit Determination of No Reasonable Cause)Attorney Kade Alexander Griffon added to party Attorney General State of Louisiana(pty:dft).(Griffon, Kade) Modified text on 9/16/2020 (mm).
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Attorney General State of Louisiana, Bellawood Apartments Home, Creekwood Elmwood, Tonti Properties. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mm) (Summons mailed via USPS to Plaintiff)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Attorney General State of Louisiana, Bellawood Apartments Home, Creekwood Elmwood, Tonti Properties filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman Ibrahim re #5 Amended Complaint. (mm)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Attorney General State of Louisiana, Bellawood Apartments Home, Creekwood Elmwood, Department of Justice Louisiana State, Julie Greem, Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO, Tonti Properties filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman Ibrahim. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Amended Complaint)(mm)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe AMENDED COMPLAINT: re #3 Amended Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/25/2020. (mm)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Attorney General State of Louisiana, Department of Justice Louisiana State, Julie Greem, Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman Ibrahim.(mm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General State of Louisiana, Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm) (Mailed via USPS to Plaintiffs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Aicha Bouchgl, Suleiman lbrahim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouchgl et al v. Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Greem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Dep of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonti Managment Co, L.L.CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Represented By: Kade Alexander Griffon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekwood Elmwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellawood Apartments Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonti Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aicha Bouchgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suleiman Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?