In The Matter of B&J Martin Inc
Petitioner: B&J Martin Inc
Claimant: Jeremy Welch
Case Number: 2:2020cv02360
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by Jeremy Welch.Attorney Brian C. Colomb added to party Jeremy Welch(pty:clm).(Colomb, Brian)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING LIMITATION PETITIONER'S SECURITY, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on August 31, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (mp)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Approve Security, Initiate Limitation Concursus and Issue Notice by B&J Martin Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice to Claimants of Limitation of Liability)(Schlotterer, Bradley)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Approve Security and Initiate Limitation Concursus is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on August 27, 2020.(mp)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&J Martin Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8467731) filed by B&J Martin Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice to Claimant of Limitation of Liability, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Bradley Joseph Schlotterer added to party B&J Martin Inc(pty:selreq).(Schlotterer, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of B&J Martin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: B&J Martin Inc
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jeremy Welch
Represented By: Brian C. Colomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?