Saucier v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Triche L Saucier
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02373
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sent t Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order, Complaint, and Pauper Letter)(mp)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2020: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp).
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Triche L Saucier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(mm)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Triche L Saucier. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient IFP)(mm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/18/2020. (mm)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Triche L Saucier. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (mm)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Triche L Saucier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saucier v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triche L Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?