Gibson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Barry Joseph Gibson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02381
Filed: August 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Attorney General Served on 09/30/2020, anser due 11/30/2020. U.S. Attorney served on 09/26/2020, answer due on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed- US Attorney, #2 Summons Returned Executed/US AG)(Breuer, Wiebke) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (am).
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(bm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
August 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8472094) filed by Barry Joseph Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons Commissioner of SSA)Attorney Wiebke Breuer added to party Barry Joseph Gibson(pty:pla).(Breuer, Wiebke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Joseph Gibson
Represented By: Wiebke Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?