In Re: The Matter of the Complaint of N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Petitioner: N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02390
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Approving Petitioner's Declaration of Value, Letters of Undertaking, and Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (ko)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to approve security to support Limitation Proceeding. This Court accepts the posted security, as required by 46 U.S.C. 30511(b) and Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/16/2020. (ko)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION approve security to support Limitation Proceeding. Document does not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (1). (cwa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Issue Restraining Order and Notice to File Claims by N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice to Claimants)(Sevin, Kelley)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION approve security to support Limitation Proceeding by N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Proposed Order)(Sevin, Kelley)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Posting of Security and Notice to the Court. ORDERED that Limitation plaintiff shall post the remaining security required by 46 U.S.C. 30511(b) and Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1) within 15 days from the date of filing of the Complaint. Once Limitation Petitioner has posted security, Limitation Petitioner shall file an Ex Parte Motion for Approval of Security, Restraining Order, Dissolution of warrants for Arrest, Notice to Claimants and Other Relief, along with accompanying proposed orders and Notices. Service of this Order may be made, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/02/2020.(ko)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8475050) filed by N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Verification, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Value, #4 Exhibit C-Primary UW Letter of Undertaking, #5 Exhibit D-Lead Excess UW Letter of Undertaking, #6 Exhibit E-Orders involving Similar Motions, #7 Proposed Motion for Temporary Dispensation of Remaining Security, #8 Proposed Order)Attorney Kelley A. Sevin added to party N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.(pty:pet).(Sevin, Kelley) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/1/2020) (pp). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2020) (pp). Modified on 9/1/2020 (mmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: The Matter of the Complaint of N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: N&W Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin
Represented By: Elton Ford Duncan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?