Hill v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tim Hill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02397
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jordan S. Harcleroad of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 9/21/2020, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 9/21/2020, and United States Attorney General on 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Mailing)(Wicklund, Edward)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cwa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/2/20. (cg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General, and United States Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8477000) by Tim Hill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tim Hill. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified referral on 9/2/2020 (cg).
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Tim Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party Tim Hill(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Hill
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?