Blanchard et al v. Tillman et al
Plaintiff: Sadie M Blanchard, Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard, Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard LLC and Sadie Michele Blanchard
Defendant: Jeffrey Scott Tillman and U.S. Term Limits
Case Number: 2:2020cv02400
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeffrey Scott Tillman. (pp)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File. The proposed pleading that is attached (Rec. Doc. 18-2) shall be filed into the record. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/27/2020. (pp)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Jeffrey Scott Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Williams, Graham)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits re #11 Motion to Strike or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss.(ko)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/26/2020. (ko)
October 25, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re rec. doc. 11 by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Sternberg, Scott) Modified text on 10/26/2020 (jls).
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits re #9 First MOTION to Remand . (Williams, Graham)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Blanchard, Sadie)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Article 971 . (Blanchard, Sadie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Article 971 by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Nick Tomboulides, #3 Notice of Submission)(Finkelstein, Michael) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (pp).
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Jeffrey Scott Tillman for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jeffrey Scott Tillman. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Notice of Submission)(Williams, Graham) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (pp).
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand by Sadie Michele Blanchard, Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #3 Notice of Submission)(Blanchard, Sadie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Pleading)(Sternberg, Scott)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Notice of Errata re #1 Notice of Removal, by Jeffrey Scott Tillman . (Sternberg, Scott) Modified text on 10/2/2020 (pp).
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**Memorandum by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-D)(Blanchard, Sadie) Modified on 10/2/2020 (pp).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Remand by Sadie Michele Blanchard, Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/1/2020. (Blanchard, Sadie) Modified on 10/2/2020 (pp).
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance RE: 28:USC 1447(B) by Jeffrey Scott Tillman, U.S. Term Limits re #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sternberg, Scott) Modified text/link on 9/8/2020 (pp).
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by U.S. Term Limits. (pp)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, case number 2020-13574 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8477532) filed by U.S. Term Limits. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Scott L. Sternberg added to party Jeffrey Scott Tillman(pty:dft), Attorney Scott L. Sternberg added to party U.S. Term Limits(pty:dft).(Sternberg, Scott) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard et al v. Tillman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie M Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee to Elect S. Michele Blanchard LLC
Represented By: Sadie Michele Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Michele Blanchard
Represented By: Sadie Michele Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Scott Tillman
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Represented By: Graham Halsey Williams
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Term Limits
Represented By: Scott L. Sternberg
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Represented By: Graham Halsey Williams
Represented By: M. Suzanne Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?