Martin v. Rowan Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Martin
Defendant: Rowan Companies, Inc. and ENSCO Offshore Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02411
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mark this action closed for statistical purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction and that the case shall be restored to the trial docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change so that it may proceed to final disposition; this order shall not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/19/20.(cg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by ENSCO Offshore Company, Rowan Companies, Inc. Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Stay or Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flint, Delos)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ENSCO Offshore Company, Rowan Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lt)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint, Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. (lt)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8479831) filed by Joshua A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Hugh Palmer Lambert added to party Joshua A. Martin(pty:pla).(Lambert, Hugh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/3/2020) (lt). Modified on 9/3/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Rowan Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Represented By: Destinee Finnin Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Represented By: Destinee Finnin Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A. Martin
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr.
Represented By: Brian James Mersman
Represented By: Jacki Lyall Smith
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?