In Re: In the Matter of Home Run Leasing, LLC
Petitioner: Home Run Leasing, LLC and Home Run Charters, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02427
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:30504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING AFFIDAVIT OF VALUE, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants) (jeg)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #8 Motion is GRANTED and this Court accepts the posted security, as required by 46 U.S.C. 30511(b) and Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1). Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 10/7/2020. (jeg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Issue Restraining Order and Notice to File Claims by Home Run Charters, LLC, Home Run Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability)(Waguespack, Constance)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Regarding Posting of Security to Support Limitation Proceeding by Home Run Charters, LLC, Home Run Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, Constance)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Home Run Charters, LLC, Home Run Leasing, LLC Ad Interim Stipulation for Value/Letter of Undertaking (Johnston, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 10/2/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING OF SECURITY AND NOTICE TO THE COURT: IT IS ORDERED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 9/4/2020. (jeg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **The Motion for Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment(s) and docketing it as a separate entry. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Temporary Dispensation of Requirement to Post Security by Home Run Charters, LLC, Home Run Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(jeg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8482589) filed by Home Run Leasing, LLC, Home Run Charters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability, #4 Verification, #5 Motion for Temporary Dispensation of Requirement To Post Security, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party Home Run Charters, LLC(pty:pet), Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party Home Run Leasing, LLC(pty:pet).(Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: In the Matter of Home Run Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Home Run Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Kristin Kay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Home Run Charters, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Kristin Kay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?