Gutierrez-Lopez v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Gutierrez-Lopez
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Attorney General of the United States and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf and William P Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv02516
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, as to Attorney General of the United States answer due 12/8/2020; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 12/8/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 12/8/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/13/2020. (jeg)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, by Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Glenn Kenneth Schreiber added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Kenneth Schreiber added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Kenneth Schreiber added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft).(Schreiber, Glenn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed. ** Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and modify the answer due dates: EDLA US Attorney's Office served on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020; United States served on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020.** (jeg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General of the United States served on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (McLin, Jaesa) Modified text/answer due date on 10/8/2020 (jeg).
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General of the United States Attorney General served on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (McLin, Jaesa) Modified text/answer due date on 10/8/2020 (jeg).
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. **1.Filing attorney included multiple summons as one attachment instead of one summons form per attachment. Clerk separated attachment in order to issue summons. Please follow this requirement on future pleadings. 2. Filing attorney did not include summons for the local US Attorney's Office. Clerk prepared summons for the local US Attorney's Office and issued them. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jeg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus against William P Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8498166) filed by Antonio Gutierrez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)Attorney Jaesa Woods McLin added to party Antonio Gutierrez-Lopez(pty:pet).(McLin, Jaesa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez-Lopez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Gutierrez-Lopez
Represented By: Jaesa Woods McLin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Glenn Kenneth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Glenn Kenneth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Glenn Kenneth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?