Who Dat, Inc. v. Who Dat Wings And More LLC et al
Plaintiff: Who Dat, Inc.
Defendant: Rashid Checken, LLC and Who Dat Wings And More LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02583
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default as to Who Dat Wings and More LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk, Cherie Stouder on 11/17/2020. (cbs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Who Dat Wings and More LLC by Who Dat, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Latham, Gregory) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (cwa).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Who Dat Wings And More LLC answer due 11/10/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/26/2020. (cwa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Incorrect case number on pleading. Please update your caption with the correct civil action number for all future filings. (cwa)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Who Dat Wings And More LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andrews, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Returned Unexecuted as to Rashid Checken, LLC. (Latham, Gregory) Modified text on 10/13/2020 (bm).
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Returned Executed; Who Dat Wings And More LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Latham, Gregory) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/13/2020) (bm). Modified text & image on 10/13/2020 (bm).
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Who Dat, Inc. (bm)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rashid Checken, LLC, Who Dat Wings And More LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8512611) filed by Who Dat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Rashid Checken, #3 Summons Summons for Who Dat Wings)Attorney Gregory D. Latham added to party Who Dat, Inc.(pty:pla).(Latham, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Who Dat, Inc. v. Who Dat Wings And More LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashid Checken, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Who Dat Wings And More LLC
Represented By: Mark Edw. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Who Dat, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Represented By: Mark Norman Melasky
Represented By: Kent C. Barnett
Represented By: Adriano M. Pacifici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?