Sullivan v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charistian Sullivan
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Actavis LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Unidentified Parties, Sandoz, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Hospira, Inc., Pfizer Inc, McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC SEPARATELY AND doing business as Winthrop U.S., Sun Pharma Global FZE and Sanofi S.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02670
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-06516. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (ecm)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the LAED. (dm) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.(MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints in these matters is stayed pending the Court's rules on the Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/12/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 Letter from defendant Sandoz, Inc. requesting an order on consent that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in each case listed on the caption. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand , #19 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Orders, #2 Exhibit Orders)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT ORDER extending time for Defendants SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. and SANOFI-VENTIS U.S. LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Master Short Form Complaint to 08/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/31/2020. (jdb) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANDOZ INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/12/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Attorney AARON VAN NOSTRAND for SANDOZ INC. added. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #19 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Certification, #7 Exhibit 3 to Certification, #8 Exhibit 4 to Certification)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/03/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Third Amended Complaint.. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Application for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Francis Manning on 07/15/2020 was submitted as an Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT Application for Extension of Time to Answer USING the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order found under other filings, other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Summons Issued by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from Sandoz, Inc. withdraws its request for a consent order to extend the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Docket # 15) re #15 Letter. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Sandoz requesting Consent Order that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, SANDOZ INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by CHARISTIAN SULLIVAN as to HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC, SANDOZ INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State CourtMOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand . (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION for Return of Property to State Court MOTION to Remand (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmh). [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference DEA) (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-003055-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10870682), filed by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC SEPARATELY AND doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charistian Sullivan
Represented By: Karen Beyea-Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?