Bidwell v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Bidwell
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Actavis LLC, Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Actavis Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Aventis Pharma S.A., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC doing business as Winthrop U.S., McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Unidentified Parties, Hospira, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Pfizer Inc, Winthrop U.S. and Sun Pharma Global FZE
Case Number: 2:2020cv02671
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 71 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-06519. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (ecm)
October 2, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the LAED. (dm) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the USDC for the LAED. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OMNIBUS STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER staying all proceedings related to Defendant, Accord Healthcare, Inc's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to Administratively Terminate the Motion to Dismiss filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc and Defendant, Accord Healthcare, Inc may renew its Motion to Dismiss at a future date by advising the Court in writing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/14/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 68 Proposed Order Staying All Proceedings Related to Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CONSENT ORDER that the time for McKesson to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints in these matters is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/02/2020. (jem)[Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 66 Letter from David J. Fioccola. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension to Respond)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 65 BRIEF in Support filed by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. Responses due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints in the matters herein is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/28/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 62 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc.a nd Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (HOTCHKISS, ANITA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #60 MOTION re #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION re #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONSENT ORDER extending the time for Defendants ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., and SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaints herein is extended to 8/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/25/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OMNIBUS STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER that the time Accord Healthcare, Inc. has to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints in the cases herein are extended up to and including 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/19/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 57 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC identifying Sanofi as Corporate Parent.. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.(MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints in these matters is stayed pending the Court's rules on the Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/12/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 53 Letter from defendant Sandoz, Inc. requesting an order on consent that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in each case listed on the caption. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CONSENT ORDER extending the time for McKesson to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints to 8/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/10/2020. (jmh) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #51 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. has been DENIED as it is beyond the scope of what the Clerk can grant. This request has been forwarded to chambers for further review. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 51 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (HOTCHKISS, ANITA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 50 Letter from David J. Fioccola. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension to Respond)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #49 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/19/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 49 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc... (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by MAHA MUNAYYER KABBASH on behalf of ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. (KABBASH, MAHA) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SUSAN BIDWELL re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Orders, #2 Exhibit Orders)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSENT ORDER extending time for Defendants SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. and SANOFI-VENTIS U.S. LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Master Short Form Complaint to 08/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/31/2020. (jdb) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 44 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONSENT ORDER that the time for McKesson to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints are hereby extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/29/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 41 Letter from David J. Fioccola. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension to Respond)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/24/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., and Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/22/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SANDOZ INC. re #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant Sandoz Inc. joinder in the Opposition To Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion To Remand and Cross-Motion To Stay All Proceedings Pending JPML Transfer (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 37 Proposed Order Consent by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (EDWARDS, EARYN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 36 Cross MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Certification, #6 Exhibit 2 to Certification, #7 Exhibit 3 to Certification, #8 Exhibit 4 to Certification)(MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #35 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, HOSPIRA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/31/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 35 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Hospira Defendants.. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaints is extended to 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/16/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #33 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PFIZER INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/04/2020. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 33 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney FRANCIS X. MANNING for PFIZER INC. added. (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 32 Letter from Sandoz, Inc., withdrawing its, 7/14/2020, request for a consent order (Docket # 31) and submits the attached revised omnibus consent order re #31 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 31 Letter from Sandoz requesting Consent Order that extends the time for Sandoz to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on McKesson Corporation on June 29, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Pfizer, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sandoz, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Actavis Pharma Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Actavis LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sanofi-Aventis US LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Winthrop U.S. on June 30, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sagent Pharmaceuticals on July 1, 2020, filed by SUSAN BIDWELL. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON VAN NOSTRAND on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The documents attached to the #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 and #18 Summons - Request For Issue filed by Karen Beyea-Schroeder, Esq. on 6/25/2020 were submitted incorrectly. For future reference, the document must be in Letter format identifying which parties a Summons must be issued for. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PFIZER INC., SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, WINTHROP U.S. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to HOSPIRA INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to Winthrop U.S.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SANDOZ INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to SAGENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to PFIZER INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to MCKESSON CORPORATION. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACTAVIS LLC. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by SUSAN BIDWELL as to ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to the #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set via telephone for 7/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Conference DEA) (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of HOSPIRA INC., HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, LLC (MANNING, FRANCIS) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-003084-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10870835), filed by HOSPIRA WOLDWIDE, INC., HOSPIRA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(NORCIA, ROBERT) [Transferred from njd on 10/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bidwell v. Hospira, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagent Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Represented By: STEPHEN C. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Represented By: ROBERT J. NORCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Maha Munayyer Kabbash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Francis X. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bidwell
Represented By: Karen Beyea-Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?