Baldos v. United Financial Casualty Co. et al
Plaintiff: Tammie Baldos
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Co., Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company in its capacity as occupational accident insurer doing business as Onebeacon Insurance and United Financial Casualty Company in its capacity as uninsured/underinsured motorist coverage insurer doing business as Progressive Insurance
Case Number: 2:2020cv02721
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2020 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company.(Tilling, Alex) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (cwa).
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 Request by United Financial Casualty Company for Notice (Giordano, Charles)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United Financial Casualty Company (Giordano, Charles)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by United Financial Casualty Company.Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party United Financial Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment and docketing it as a separate entry. (mp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. (mp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 809-860 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8532120) filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 COMPLIANCE pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b), #7 Supplement Notice of State Court Filing, #8 Supplement Proposed State Court Filing, #9 State Court Pleadings, #10 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)Attorney Alex P Tilling added to party Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Tilling, Alex) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldos v. United Financial Casualty Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex P Tilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company in its capacity as occupational accident insurer doing business as Onebeacon Insurance
Represented By: Katie F. Wollfarth
Represented By: Alex P Tilling
Represented By: Robert McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company in its capacity as uninsured/underinsured motorist coverage insurer doing business as Progressive Insurance
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Baldos
Represented By: Jason F. Giles
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Milazzo, III
Represented By: Toni R Arnona
Represented By: Brian King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?