Allied Shipyard Inc v. Moore
Plaintiff: Allied Shipyard Inc
Defendant: Logan Moore
Case Number: 2:2020cv02744
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
3 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle, Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/01/2020.(ko)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Consolidate. Because filings by parties' counsel merely offer repetitive arguments, cite to previously filed memoranda, and state obvious conclusions, as the instant one, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no supplemental memorandum will be accepted for filing from any party unless ordered by the court or where the proposed memorandum cites new, relevant, and admissible facts or law and reasons why it was not previously discovered through the timely exercise of due diligence. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/24/2020. (ko)
November 23, 2020 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (pp).
November 23, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Allied Shipyard Inc, in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/23/2020. (ko)
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Logan Moore re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 H(3). (ko)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/23/2020. (ko)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 4/28/2021. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (dw)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 11/20/2020 (pp).
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate by Logan Moore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Barousse, William) Modified on 11/20/2020 (pp).
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum)(Callais, Lee) Modified on 11/19/2020 (pp).
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 **DEFICIENT**Supplemental Memorandum filed by Allied Shipyard Inc, in Opposition of 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 H(3) . (Callais, Lee) Modified on 11/18/2020 (pp).
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 **DEFICIENT**Supplemental Memorandum filed by Allied Shipyard Inc, in Support of 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Callais, Lee) Modified on 11/18/2020 (pp).
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Logan Moore re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Barousse, William)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 **DEFICIENT**REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Logan Moore re 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 H(3) . (Barousse, William) Modified on 11/18/2020 (pp).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Request/Statement of Oral Argument: IT IS ORDERED that the request is denied subject to further Court order. At this time, the Court will consider the Motion to Consolidate Cases (Rec. Doc. 9) on the parties' briefings. If it later appears to the Court that oral argument would be helpful, it will be ordered. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/16/2020.(ko)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Allied Shipyard Inc re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 . (Callais, Lee)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Logan Moore regarding #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 (Barousse, William)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with civil action 20-2431 H(3) by Logan Moore. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in earlier-filed action, #2 Exhibit B- amended complaint in earlier filed action, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Notice of Submission)(Barousse, William) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (jls).
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Allied Shipyard Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Callais, Lee)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance to #1 Notice of Removal by Logan Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - state court return of summons)(Barousse, William) Modified text/link on 10/22/2020 (pp).
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Answer to Removal, Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge (4). (lt)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Logan Moore. (lt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Logan Moore.(Barousse, William) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (lt).
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court, Lafourche Parish, case number C-141354, Div. A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8536032) filed by Logan Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court pleadings served on defendant, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney William A. Barousse added to party Logan Moore(pty:dft).(Barousse, William) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Shipyard Inc v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Shipyard Inc
Represented By: Lee Anthony Callais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Moore
Represented By: William A. Barousse
Represented By: Donald Cole Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?