Venture Global Gator Express, LLC v. Land et al
Plaintiff: VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC
Defendant: ESP LOUISIANA OPPORTUNITIES, LLC, CAPTAIN ZACHS MYRTLE GROVE PROPERTIES, LLC, A PIPELINE SERVITUDE SERVITUDE ACROSS A PARCEL OF PROPERTY SITUATED IN SECTION 45, TOWNSHIP 17 SOUTH, RANGE 25 EAST, PLAQUEMINES PARISH, LOUISIANA, Captain Zach's Myrtle Grove Properties, LLC and Land
Case Number: 2:2020cv02802
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:0717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2020 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ESP Louisiana Opportunities, LLC (Piontek, Luke)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Venture Global Gator Express, LLC by Captain Zach's Myrtle Grove Properties, LLC. Attorney Wade P. Webster added to party Captain Zach's Myrtle Grove Properties, LLC(pty:dft).(Webster, Wade) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (cg).
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and Objections and, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against ESP Louisiana Opportunities, LLC by ESP Louisiana Opportunities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice of Option - Plaquemines Parish), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Option - St. Charles Parish), #3 Exhibit C (ESP 8-13-20 letter), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted JEA), #5 Exhibit E (Plaquemines Port Press Release), #6 Exhibit F (Brandt Estate Mitigation Bank Map), #7 Exhibit G (Venture Global 8-20-20 letter))Attorney Luke Francis Piontek added to party ESP Louisiana Opportunities, LLC(pty:dft).(Piontek, Luke)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Captain Zach's Myrtle Grove Properties, LLC, ESP Louisiana Opportunities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Charpentier, Troy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Charpentier, Troy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC. (Charpentier, Troy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC (Charpentier, Troy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPTAIN ZACHS MYRTLE GROVE PROPERTIES, LLC, ESP LOUISIANA OPPORTUNITIES, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8544908) filed by VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Troy J. Charpentier added to party VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC(pty:pla).(Charpentier, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venture Global Gator Express, LLC v. Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESP LOUISIANA OPPORTUNITIES, LLC
Represented By: Luke Francis Piontek
Represented By: Andre' G. Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN ZACHS MYRTLE GROVE PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A PIPELINE SERVITUDE SERVITUDE ACROSS A PARCEL OF PROPERTY SITUATED IN SECTION 45, TOWNSHIP 17 SOUTH, RANGE 25 EAST, PLAQUEMINES PARISH, LOUISIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Zach's Myrtle Grove Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert Stephen Rooth
Represented By: Wade P. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VENTURE GLOBAL GATOR EXPRESS, LLC
Represented By: Troy J. Charpentier
Represented By: Matthew B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?