Cox Operating, L.L.C. v. Atina M/V et al
Plaintiff: Cox Operating, L.L.C.
Defendant: Hanzhou 1 Ltd, Atina M/V and F. Onur Hurmuzlu
Petitioner: Louisiana Oil & Gas Association and Louisiana State
Consolidated Petitioner: Ciner Ship Management, Atina Maritime Limited, Hanzhou 1, Ltd., Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S. and Atina M/T
3Rd Party Defendant: Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans
Case Number: 2:2020cv02845
Filed: October 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER AND REASONS: granting #65 Motion to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim Against Master of Vessel, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/03/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #155 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #152 Third Party Complaint as to Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans answer due 12/9/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/29/21. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #152 Third Party Complaint by Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:20-cv-02845; 2:20-cv-02871)Attorney Robert R. Johnston added to party Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans(pty:3pd).(Johnston, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Reference: All cases)(Murphy, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Third Party Summons Issued as to Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans filed by Atina M/T, Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd., Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S.(Reference: All Cases)(am)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Demand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/26/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Demand by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd., Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 20-2845 and 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/8/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER AND REASONS that Claimants Motion to Amend Protective Order #126 andPetitioners Motion to Compel #128 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/1/2021. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Minute Order for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: A hearing was held by video on this date on Claimant's Motion to Amend Protective Order (ECF No. #126 ) and Limitation Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order (ECF No. #128 ). After oral argument, the matter was taken under submission. An order setting out the reasons for my ruling will be separately issued. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/29/2021. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #126 MOTION to Amend Protective Order. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING #144 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/27/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Protective Order (R. Doc. 126) by Cox Operating, L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claims Against the Master of Vessel)(Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871 All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text/referral on 9/27/2021 (sa).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Limitation Fund BOND in the amount of $ $39,532,808.20 posted by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. (Reference: All Cases) (NEF to Financial unit)(am)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Leave to File Bond for Limitation Fund and Cancellation and Return of Letter of Undertaking. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/23/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Bond for Limitation Fund and Cancellation and Return of Letter of Undertaking by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Bond for Limitation Fund)(Reference: All cases)(Murphy, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING #138 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/22/2021. (Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: All cases)(Murphy, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #126 MOTION to Amend Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order . (Reference: All cases)(Murphy, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #134 Motion to Continue Discovery Hearings (ECF Nos. 126 & 128) and setting same for 9/29/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/8/2021. (Reference: 20-2845; 20-2871)(DPC)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order . (Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (am).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Dates by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (am).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER that the pending Motion to Amend Protective Order #126 and Motion to Compel #128 currently scheduled for submission on 9/8/2021 #122 are CONTINUED and rescheduled for submission on 9/15/2021. FURTHER ORDERED that any Opposition Memoranda currently due on 8/31/2021 be filed by Tuesday, 9/7/2021. In the event that the impact of Hurricane Ida precludes any party from responding by the 9/7/ 2021 deadline, that party should seek a further continuance of the submission date and related response deadlines. FURTHER ORDERED that Cox Operating, LLCs Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/1/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(caa)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel [R. Doc. 128] by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845; 20-2871)(Amy, Jeanne)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER AND REASONS: granting in part #26 Motion to Increase Security and Require Surety Bond, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/27/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a video oral argument on #126 Motion to Amend Protective Order, is hereby scheduled on WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. A log-in invitation for the video conference will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/25/2021. (Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. ** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Current Protective Order by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule 37 Certificate, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(Reference: All Cases)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (am).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cox Operating, L.L.C. regarding #126 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order . (Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (am).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Amend Protective Order by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rodney Dykes, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (am).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Amicus Curiae Brief by Louisiana State (Reference: All Cases)(pp)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Amicus Curiae Brief by Louisiana Oil & Gas Association (Reference: All Cases)(pp)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER:IT IS ORDERED that the #97 , #103 Motions are GRANTED, and the briefs shall be filed into the record. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/20/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(pp)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Discovery (ECF No. #115 ) is GRANTED, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/30/2021. (Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email String)(Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 6/22/2021 (am).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING #118 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and the Motion to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE (R. Doc. #106 ) is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/17/2021. (Reference: 20-2871)(sa)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, #103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae . (Reference: 20-2871)(Sloss, Peter)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss R. Doc. 106 Cox's Emergency Motion to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform without Prejudice by Cox Operating, L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text/referral on 6/17/2021 (sa).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. **1. In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings. **2. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that the #106 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform is set for Oral Argument on 6/23/2021 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. FURTHER ORDERED that any Opposition be filed on or before Tuesday, 6/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/11/2021.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(DePaula, Timothy) Modified text/added referral on 6/14/2021 (am).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #106 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/10/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2021; Ordered #107 MOTION to Expedite Cox's Emergency Motion to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that, absent a referral, the Clerk notice the #106 Emergency MOTION to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform for submission on the next available motion day before the Honorable Jane Triche Milazzo. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/30/2021. (NEF: Sect H) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Discovery Conference held on 6/9/2021. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #26 Motion to Increase Security . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: 20-2871)(am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: GRANTING #108 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 06/09/2021. (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Security and to Require Limitation Petitioners to Post a Corporate Surety Bond and to Allow Additional Pages. **Document no longer deemed deficient.** (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Security and to Require Limitation Petitioners to Post a Corporate Surety Bond and to Allow Additional Pages by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (am).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Cox's Emergency Motion to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 **WITHDRAWN** Emergency MOTION to Enjoin Petitioners from Contacting BSEE to Propose Work or Anything Related to Execution of the Work on Cox's Platform by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified on 6/17/2021 (sa).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a status conference is hereby scheduled on WEDNESDAY, JUNE 9, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The status conference will be held via video conference, and a log-in invitation will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/8/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by State of Louisiana. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading Amicus Brief, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: all cases)Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:am).(Murrill, Elizabeth) Modified text/removed referral on 6/8/2021 (am).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Oral Argument was held on this date on Defendants' Motion to Compel (ECF No. #87 ). After having considered the record, the written and oral submissions and arguments of counsel, and the applicable law, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/2/2021. (Court Reporter Sandy Minutillo.) (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #26 MOTION Increase Security . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C., in Opposition to #87 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) finding as moot #98 Motion for Leave to File as Supplemental Memorandum was filed pursuant to Court's May 26, 2021 Order. Clerk is directed to docket the Supplemental Memorandum.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/1/2021. (Reference: 20-2845)(DPC)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Regarding Estimated Costs of Proposed Protocols by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Justin Bucknell)(Reference: 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 6/2/2021 (am).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by Louisiana Oil & Gas Association. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading Proposed Amicus Curiae, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)Attorney Heather Shauri Lonian added to party Louisiana Oil & Gas Association(pty:mov).(Lonian, Heather) Modified on 6/2/2021 (am).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Atina M/V, Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #87 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #93 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 5/27/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #93 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel. **The case reference in the docket text must match the case reference listed on the document. Please follow this requirement on all future filings. Clerk modified the docket text. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Bartlett)(Reference: All Cases)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 5/27/2021 (am).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re #87 MOTION to Compel - IT IS ORDERED that the parties file supplemental memoranda before noon on Tuesday, June 1, 2021, regarding their estimated costs to proceed via their proposed protocols to retrieve the testing samples, including an affidavit or other evidence of those estimated costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 5/26/2021.(Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the Motion to Compel (ECF No. #87 ) is hereby scheduled on WEDNESDAY, JUNE 2, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault, 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. This hearing will be conducted in-person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 5/25/2021.(Reference: 20-2845)(sa)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #89 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **The case reference in the docket text must match the case reference listed on the document. Please follow this requirement on all future filings. Clerk modified the docket text. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #87 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anomaly 23 Extract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Versowsky, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Bucknell)(Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 5/18/2021 (am).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #87 MOTION to Compel. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(am)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Compel by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule 37(a) Certificate, #3 Exhibit A-I, #4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 5/12/2021 (am).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #26 MOTION Increase Security filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. IT IS ORDERED that Cox Operating's Motion to Increase Security is SET for submission on June 8, 2021, and all supplemental briefing on the remaining issue regarding the form of security shall be filed in accordance with local rules. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(egs)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Evidentiary Hearing Exhibit List. (Reference: Both Cases)(ecm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Evidentiary Hearing completed on 4/28/2021. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (Reference: Both Cases)(am)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Evidentiary Hearing began on 4/27/2021 re #26 MOTION to Increase Security. Witness testimony and evidence entered. Court recessed until April 28, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OBJECTIONS to Limitation Petitioners'Exhibits by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #80 Exhibit List (Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (am).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Witness List by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (lt).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Exhibit List by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (lt).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Witness List by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Status Conference held on 4/21/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the hearing previously set for 4/27/2021 shall take place by video. A link to join the video hearing will be disseminated to counsel at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 4/23/2021, the parties shall file witness lists of all witnesses that may be called to testify at the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 4/23/2021, the parties shall deliver to chambers two tabbed-bench books of exhibits, with a corresponding exhibit list. To the extent practicable, the parties should attempt to combine the exhibits in one joint bench book, as set forth in document. (Reference: 20-2871)(pp)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #65 MOTION to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim Against Master of Vessel . (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/21/21. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to re #26 MOTION Increase Security filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd., Hanzhou 1, Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11 through 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20 through 32)(Reference: 20-2845)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (pp).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871)(LeBreton, Edward)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in support of #65 Cox's Motion to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim by Cox Operating, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claims Against the Master of Vessel)(Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871 All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text/link on 4/21/2021 (pp).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #65 MOTION to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim Against Master of Vessel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F declaration of Eddy Morland)(Reference: All Cases)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (am).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: GRANTING #70 Motion for Extension of Time to File, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/13/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply/Opposition Memorandum by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845)(Murphy, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jefferson Randolph Tillery, Marc C. Hebert and Catherine Barrett Rice are WITHDRAWN as co-counsel of record for Cox Operating, LLC in these consolidated matters. Cox Operating, LLC will continue to be represented in these matters by George J. Fowler, III, Edward F. LeBreton, III, Richard D. Bertram, and Jeanne L. Amy. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/30/2021. (Reference: Both Cases)(ecm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 MOTION to Continue Submission Date. The submission date for #65 MOTION to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim Against Master of Vessel is hereby continued to 4/21/2021. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 03/29/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(ko)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jefferson R. Tillery, Marc C. Hebert, C. Barrett Rice as Attorney by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871, All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845 and 20-2871)(Tompkins, Peter)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Modify Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims and to Allow Pursuit of Claim Against Master of Vessel by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (am).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vincent DeVito. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (Reference: All Cases)(pp)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Vincent Devito (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8739626) by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(LeBreton, Edward) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/19/2021) (pp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021: #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 ECf Registration Form) (pp).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/11/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the hearing previously set for 03/18/2021 is CONTINUED and RESET for 4/27/2021 at 8:30a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery related to the valuation of the vessel and freight shall be completed by 4/9/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Claimant Cox Operating LLC's Motion to Increase Security #26 is CONTINUED and RESET for submission on 4/27/2021. All briefs shall be filed by 4/20/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status conference is SET for 4/21/2021 at 2:00p.m. (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: GRANTING #60 Motion Noting Default. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/28/2021. (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Noting Default by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/27/2021. IT IS ORDERED that a follow-up telephone status conference is SET for February 11, 2021 at 10:30a.m., as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery related to the valuation of the vessel and freight shall be completed by February 25, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Claimant Cox Operating LLC's Motion to Increase Security #26 is SET for submission on March 10, 2021, and a hearing is SET for March 18, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #39 Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Terminate Motions, IT IS ORDERED that the status conference previously set for January 28, 2021 is RESET for January 27, 2021 at 1:30p.m. by telephone. The parties shall call 888-273-3658 and use access code 1304800. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(egs)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND REASONS: DENYING #36 Motion to Lift Stay and Request Security, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/19/2021. (Reference: 20-2845)(am)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE and Proof of Publication by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Publication)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert) Modified text on 12/22/2020 (am).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Discovery Conference held on 12/15/2020 regarding a scheduled underwater inspection. The Court instructed the parties to make best efforts to accomplish a separate live feed for Cox's representative. In the event that simultaneous live feed was not possible despite all of their best efforts, the M/V ATINA interests must provide the unedited video (without audio) of the dive promptly. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 12/16/2020. (Reference: Both Cases)(sa)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #52 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney George J. Fowler, III,Edward Francis LeBreton, III,Richard D. Bertram for Cox Operating, L.L.C. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/10/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James R. Dugan, II and David Scott Scalia terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record George J. Fowler, III, Edward F. LeBreton, III, Richard D. Bertram by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845, 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw James R. Dugan, II and David S. Scalia by Cox Operating, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Withdraw, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Dugan, James) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (am). Modified on 12/9/2020 (sa).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Edward Cain and Stephen J. Herman terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/8/20. (Reference: 20-2871)(ecm)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Stephen J. Herman, Joseph E. Cain, and Herman Herman & Katz, LLC as Attorney for Cox Operating LLC by Cox Operating, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (am).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #36 MOTION Lift Stay to Require Security . (Reference: 20-2871)(Sloss, Peter)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motions to Compel (ECF Nos. #40 & #44 ) are DISMISSED AS MOOT as the matters have been resolved by the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for this afternoon is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/23/2020. (Reference: 20-2871)(sa)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion to Expedite. IT IS ORDERED that the motion be and is hereby GRANTED, and that Hearing on Cox's Motion to Compel (Rec. Doc. #44 ) be and is hereby scheduled for 4:00 o'clock p.m. on the 23rd day of November, 2020, via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/23/2020. (Reference: 20-2871)(sa)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Compel by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Compel by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #40 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents and Cross-Motion to Compel Documents from Vessel Owners. (Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite (ECF No. #41 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any Opposition Memoranda to the #40 Motion to Allow Immediate Discovery and to Compel Expedited Production of Documents be filed on or before 9:00 a.m. on Monday, November 23, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #40 Motion to Allow Immediate Discovery and to Compel Expedited Production of Documents shall be heard via video conference on Monday, November 23, 2020, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/20/2020.(Reference: 20-2871)(sa)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Allow Immediate Discovery and Compel Production of Documents (R. Doc. 40) by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1,2,3,4 and 5, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite #28 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's Motion to Increase Security is GRANTED, and the Motion is continued without date Rec. Doc. #26 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is SET for 01/28/2021 at 11:00a.m. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/17/2020.(Reference: All Cases)(am)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #33 MOTION to Continue Submission Date . (Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Limitation Petitioners' Motion for Expedited Hearing of their Motion to Continue Submission Date #34 is GRANTED, and Petitioners' Motion to Continue Submission Date is hereby scheduled to be submitted to the Court, on briefs, on 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/12/2020.(Reference: 20-2871)(am)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION Lift Stay to Require Security by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Norm Dufour, #3 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2845)(Herman, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Claim in Limitation by Cox Operating, L.L.C.(Reference: 20-2871)(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (am).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Submission Date (R. Doc 33) by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Atina Maritime Limited, Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S., Ciner Ship Management, Hanzhou 1, Ltd. re #28 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Increase Security [Doc 26] . (Reference: 20-2871)(Murphy, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #28 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Increase Security [Doc 26] filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C., #30 Memorandum filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C. IT IS ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite shall be filed by November 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(egs)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Clarification Regarding Motion to Expedite by Cox Operating, L.L.C. re #28 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Increase Security [Doc 26] [Clarification] (Reference:All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (am).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - The parties have advised the Court that they have resolved their discovery issues raised by Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection (ECF No. #15 ). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion (ECF Nos. #15 ) is DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/6/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Increase Security [Doc 26] by Cox Operating, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (am).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cox Operating, L.L.C. regarding #26 MOTION Increase Security (Reference: All Cases(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (am).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION Increase Security by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified text on 11/9/2020 (am).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Joint Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Protective Order is entered into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/4/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement (ECF No. #21 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's additional arguments will be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/4/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845; 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Status Conference held on 11/3/2020 regarding Cox Operating, LLC's Motion to Supplement (ECF No. 21) and Motion for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection. ECF No. 15. After discussion, counsel agreed to work together to address plaintiff's requested relief and to advise the Court of their progress prior to the video conference set for Friday, November 6, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/4/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Rule 37 Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite hearing (ECF No. #16 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any Opposition Memoranda to the Motion for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection (ECF No. #15 ) is to be filed on or before 1:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 5, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Compel (ECF No. #15 ) shall be heard via video conference on Friday, November 6, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are reminded of the duty to preserve electronically stored information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/2/2020.(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cox Operating, L.L.C. regarding #15 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Evidene and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection. (Reference: 20-2871)(am)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney James R. Dugan, II, David Scott Scalia, Stephen J. Herman, Joseph Edward Cain for Cox Operating, L.L.C. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/3/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2845; 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion for Protective Order to Preserve Evidence and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection by Cox Operating, L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson) Modified text on 11/3/2020 (am).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Protective Order to Preserve Evidene and Motion to Compel Deposition and Joint Inspection by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Pleading Rule 37 Certificate, #4 Proposed Pleading Request for Oral Argument, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2871)(Tillery, Jefferson)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that 20-2871 is hereby CONSOLIDATED with 20-2845. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/22/2020.(am)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE FILING OF REC. DOC. 12**SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Tillery, Jefferson) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (am).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; F. Onur Hurmuzlu served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Goodier, Glenn)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to F. Onur Hurmuzlu. (am)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Verification, #3 Summons)(Tillery, Jefferson)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion appointing special process server. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Appoint Special Process Server by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillery, Jefferson)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/19/2020. (3cc: USM)(am)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian National Maritime Services, Inc. by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillery, Jefferson)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest issued. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem as to M/V ATINA. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (sek)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillery, Jefferson)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8552525) filed by Cox Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Jefferson Randolph Tillery added to party Cox Operating, L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Tillery, Jefferson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox Operating, L.L.C. v. Atina M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Ciner Ship Management
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Atina Maritime Limited
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Hanzhou 1, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Besiktas Likid Tasmacilik Denizcilik Ticaret A.S.
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Atina M/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanzhou 1 Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atina M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Onur Hurmuzlu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Operating, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jefferson Randolph Tillery
Represented By: Catherine Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jeanne Louise Amy
Represented By: Marc C. Hebert
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Scott Scalia
Represented By: Edward Francis LeBreton, III
Represented By: Richard D. Bertram
Represented By: Joseph Edward Cain
Represented By: Stephen J. Herman
Represented By: George J. Fowler, III
Represented By: Vincent DeVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louisiana Oil & Gas Association
Represented By: Edward B. Poitevent, II
Represented By: Heather Shauri Lonian
Represented By: W. Brett Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louisiana State
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Associated Branch Pilots of the Port of New Orleans
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Represented By: Constance C Waguespack
Represented By: Courtney Crowell
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?