Courcelle v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joann Johnson Courcelle
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02920
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jordan S. Harcleroad of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 11/06/2020, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 11/12/2020, and United States Attorney General on 11/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavit of Mailing)(Wicklund, Edward)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 10/27/20. (cg)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cwa)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8566553) by Joann Johnson Courcelle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8566529) filed by Joann Johnson Courcelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party Joann Johnson Courcelle(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courcelle v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Johnson Courcelle
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?