PB International Investment Fund, LTD. v. Safira M/Y
Plaintiff: PB International Investment Fund, LTD.
Not Classified By Court: National Maritime Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Schotell, Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Safira M/Y and Safira Maritime Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02932
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Umberto Bonavita (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8654724) by Safira M/Y, Safira Maritime Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (SD Florida), #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Umberto Bonavita, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Attorney Registration Statement, #5 Proposed Order)(Bagot, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/22/2020) (jls). Modified text on 12/22/2020 (am).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 9/2/2021. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/11/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. To join the conference, counsel must dial (888) 273-3658 and use access code: 1304800. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ecm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 68 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by Schotell, Inc., Safira Maritime Holdings, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bland, Rachel) Modified text on 12/22/2020 (am).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Serena Angelette Witter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
December 17, 2020 Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Serena A. Witter (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8648568) by Safira M/Y. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (SD Florida), #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (MD Florida), #3 Exhibit C- Certificate of Good Standing (ND Florida), #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Serena A Witter, #5 Exhibit E- Attorney Registration Statement, #6 Consent to Electronic Filing, #7 Proposed Order)(Bagot, Michael) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (am).
December 11, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone for the purpose of resetting the trial date and pre-trial deadlines. Counsel are to participate in the conference by dialing (877) 411-9748 and using access code 7562821. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Third Party Complaint, by Schotell, Inc.(Bland, Rachel) Modified text on 12/11/2020 (am).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: GRANTING #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas J Zeher. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Ramer Karcher.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
November 13, 2020 Filing 57 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas J Zeher (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8595643) by Safira M/Y. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Nicholas J Zeher, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Statement, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing, #5 Proposed Order)(Bagot, Michael) Modified text on 11/13/2020 (am).
November 12, 2020 Filing 56 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid) by Safira M/Y. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Michael R. Karcher, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Statement, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing, #5 Proposed Order)(Bagot, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Filing 55 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8592911) by Safira M/Y. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Michael R. Karcher, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Statement, #4 Proposed Order)(Bagot, Michael) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (am).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #53 Motion to Enroll as additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Michael H. Bagot, Jr, Thomas Arnoult Rayer, Jr, and G. Beauregard Gelpi for Safira M/Y. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/12/2020. (ecm)
November 11, 2020 Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Michael H. Bagot, Jr., Thomas A. Rayer, Jr., G. Beauregard Gelpi by Safira M/Y. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael H. Bagot, Jr added to party Safira M/Y(pty:dft).(Bagot, Michael) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (am).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #51 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David S. Bland and Rachel St. Paul Bland for Schotell, Inc. Attorney William R. Boeringer terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/9/2020. (ecm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David S. Bland; Rachel S. Bland to be substituted in place of William R. Boeringer by Schotell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David S. Bland added to party Schotell, Inc(pty:3pd).(Bland, David)
October 28, 2020 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:20-cv-60495. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order granting in part and denying in part #25 Motion to Transfer Venue; All pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 48 Third Party MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Third-Party Plaintiff's Request for Production by Schotell, Inc. Responses due by 11/5/2020 (Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 47 Witness List by Schotell, Inc.. (Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 46 Witness List of Fact Witnesses by M/Y Safira.. (Zeher, Nicholas) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 Third Party MOTION to Continue Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines re #31 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, filed by M/Y Safira. Replies due by 9/10/2020. (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 44 Third Party MOTION to Continue Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines re #31 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Schotell, Inc. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal of M/Y Safira by M/Y Safira (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint filed by Schotell, Inc. (Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 40 Amended NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 8/27/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint filed by M/Y Safira. Replies due by 6/9/2020. (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by M/Y Safira. Replies due by 6/9/2020. (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added James N. Hurley as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #25 . M/Y SAFIRA shall respond to Third Party Defendant SCHOTTEL, INC.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue no later than June 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/27/2020. (lbn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike #29 . Defendant M/Y SAFIRA shall respond to the Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses no later than June 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/27/2020. (lbn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #25 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by M/Y Safira. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 33 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #29 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Affirmative Defenses by M/Y Safira. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 12/1/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2020., Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2020., Fact Discovery due by 11/20/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2020., Mediation Deadline 12/1/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/16/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2020., Motions due by 2/16/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 30 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by M/Y Safira (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Affirmative Defenses by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. Responses due by 5/27/2020 (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PB International Investment Fund, LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Tdub, LLC for PB International Investment Fund, LTD. (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Jury Demand filed by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schotell, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schottel GmbH for Schotell, Inc (Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint by Schotell, Inc. Attorney William R. Boeringer added to party Schotell, Inc(pty:3pd). Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boeringer, William) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by PB International Investment Fund, LTD. (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Jury Demand filed by M/Y Safira. Replies due by 5/12/2020. (Zeher, Nicholas) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Joint Scheduling Report/Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosures due by 5/5/2020 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint Jury Demand by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. Responses due by 5/5/2020 (Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Schotell, Inc. (ail) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Schotell, Inc by M/Y Safira. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Umberto C. Bonavita on behalf of M/Y Safira. Attorney Umberto C. Bonavita added to party M/Y Safira(pty:dft). (Bonavita, Umberto) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas J Zeher on behalf of M/Y Safira. Attorney Nicholas J Zeher added to party M/Y Safira(pty:dft). (Zeher, Nicholas) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Serena Angelette Witter on behalf of M/Y Safira. Attorney Serena Angelette Witter added to party M/Y Safira(pty:dft). (Witter, Serena) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing the Release of a Vessel Under Supplemental Rule E(5) re #11 Stipulation filed by M/Y Safira Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 CLAIM of Owner by M/Y Safira. (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Excecuted as to Dania Cut Canal South Side-Seahaven Superhaven Superyacht Marina. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 22, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Release of the Vessel by M/Y Safira (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ramer Karcher on behalf of M/Y Safira. Attorney Michael Ramer Karcher added to party M/Y Safira(pty:dft). (Karcher, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 Warrant In Rem Issued as to M/Y Safira. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM OF THE M/Y SAFIRA; granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian; National Maritime Services, Inc. appointed. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian. (See DE 5.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/10/2020. (lbn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Appoint National Maritime Services, Inc. as Custodian by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Consent and Indemnification Agreement)(Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint National Maritime Services, Inc. as Custodian by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. Responses due by 3/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Consent and Indemnification Agreement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by PB International Investment Fund, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant)(Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/Y Safira. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12565169, filed by PB International Investment Fund, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooke, Adam) [Transferred from flsd on 10/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PB International Investment Fund, LTD. v. Safira M/Y
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PB International Investment Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Represented By: Robert Dewitt McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: National Maritime Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Schotell, Inc
Represented By: William R. Boeringer
Represented By: David S. Bland
Represented By: Rachel St. Paul Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Safira M/Y
Represented By: Nicholas J Zeher
Represented By: Serena Angelette Witter
Represented By: Michael Ramer Karcher
Represented By: Umberto C. Bonavita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Safira Maritime Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Zeher
Represented By: Michael Ramer Karcher
Represented By: Umberto C. Bonavita
Represented By: Serena Witter
Represented By: Thomas Arnoult Rayer, Jr.
Represented By: G. Beauregard Gelpi
Represented By: Michael H. Bagot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?