Ping May Maritime LLC v. Jiangsu Steamship Pte, Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Ping May Maritime llc and Ping May Maritime, LLC
Defendant: Spring Sunshine Shipping Ltd., Jiangsu Steamship Pte, Ltd., Jiangsu Steamship Co. Ltd. and Jiangsu Huaxi Ocean Shipping Management Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02953
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 Manual Attachment Received (Paper Copies of Exhibits A-R) re #1 Complaint, attachment 3 filed by Ping May Maritime, LLC. (mm)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to all defendants by Ping May Maritime, LLC. (Sloss, Peter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint Representative to Serve Vessel with Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (lag)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (lag)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Permit Vessel Movement. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (lag)
November 1, 2020 Filing 14 WRIT of Foreign Attachment issued. (lag)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Attachment pursuant to Admiralty Rule B. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (lag)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) finding as moot #6 Motion to permit vessel movement because the motion was refiled at R. Doc. #7 . Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (tjg)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) finding as moot #5 Motion for appointment of representative because the motion was refiled at R. Doc. #9 . Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (tjg)
November 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) finding as moot #4 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian because the motion was refiled at R. Doc. #8 . Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 11/1/2020. (tjg)
October 31, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Representative to Serve Vessel with Writ of Attachment by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sloss, Peter)
October 31, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A Declaration and Certificate of Insurance)(Sloss, Peter)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sloss, Peter)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Sloss, Peter)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Appointing Representative to Serve Vessel with Writ of Attachment by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sloss, Peter)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Certificate of Liability Insurance)(Sloss, Peter) Modified text on 11/2/2020 (mm).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Attachment Pursuant to Rule B by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading WRIT, #2 Proposed Order)(Sloss, Peter)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8573629) filed by Ping May Maritime LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Manual Attachment Exhibits) Attorney Peter Brooks Sloss added to party Ping May Maritime llc(pty:pla).(Sloss, Peter) (Additional Manual attachment(s) added on 11/18/2020: #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibits E & E1, #9 Exhibits F & F1, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ping May Maritime LLC v. Jiangsu Steamship Pte, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Sunshine Shipping Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Steamship Pte, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Steamship Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Huaxi Ocean Shipping Management Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping May Maritime llc
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping May Maritime, LLC
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Represented By: John Herr Musser, V
Represented By: Peter B. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?