Hutsell v. Triton Diving Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen Edward Hutsell
Defendant: Triton Diving Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02955
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.(dp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Triton Diving Services, LLC.Attorney Morgan Elizabeth Kelley added to party Triton Diving Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Kelley, Morgan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Triton Diving Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8573713) filed by Stephen Edward Hutsell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Bobby J. Delise added to party Stephen Edward Hutsell(pty:pla).(Delise, Bobby) Modified on 11/2/2020 Attorney requests to waive service at this time (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutsell v. Triton Diving Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Diving Services, LLC
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Kelley
Represented By: Michael L. McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Edward Hutsell
Represented By: Bobby J. Delise
Represented By: Jeannette Monet Delise
Represented By: Alton Jerold Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?