Hawkins v. Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Martha Hawkins
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., XYZ Insurance Company, Abbott Laboratories International LLC, Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2020cv02962
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Continue filed by Martha Hawkins. The submission date for the motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Rec. Doc. 7) is hereby RESET to January 13, 2021, without oral argument. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/17/20.(cg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Martha Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Obioha, Pius)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Request by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories International LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FDA PMA 2017 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - FDA PMA 2018 Letter)(Gay, Terry)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Petition and First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories International LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Gay, Terry)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants may file their responsive pleadings no later than November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/4/2020. (pp)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 Response/Reply by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories International LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. to #3 Order Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(B) (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Removal Notice)(Gay, Terry)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories International LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gay, Terry) Modified on 11/4/2020 (cg).
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(cg)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court for Jefferson Parish, case number 810-264 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8576073) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Petition and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Cases, #3 State Court Pleadings Petition, #4 State Court Pleadings Return of Services, #5 State Court Pleadings Miscellaneous, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Terry Christovich Gay added to party Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Terry Christovich Gay added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Terry Christovich Gay added to party Abbott Laboratories International LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Terry Christovich Gay added to party Abbott Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft).(Gay, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Terry Christovich Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Christovich Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories International LLC
Represented By: Terry Christovich Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation
Represented By: Terry Christovich Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hawkins
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?