Sanchez v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elridge Joseph Sanchez, Jr
Defendant: CBS Corporation, IDEX Corporation, International Paper Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Grefco, Inc., Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, Travelers Indemnity Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, U.S. Plywood Corporation, Champion International Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., John Crane Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Monsanto Company, Maryland Casualty Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, CSR Ltd, General Electric Company, Viacom Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Viking Pump Inc, Commerical Union Insurance Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Benjamin Foster Co, Crescent Materials Service Inc, Crane Company, FMC Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, Anco Insulations Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC, Goulds Pumps LLC, Lamorak Insurance Company and Atwood & Morril
Cross Defendant: Champion International Corp., Pharmacia Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Company and Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02973
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is set before District Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/7/2021 at 2:00 p.m. BY TELEPHONE as stated herein. The Court suspends Local Civil Rule 26.2(B) in this case and requires the parties to file into the record a written report outlining their proposed discovery plan no later than five business days before the date of the conference as stated herein. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/4/2020. (mm)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion to Supplement Notice of 28 U.S.C. 1447(B) Compliance re: rec. doc. 99. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/25/2020. (mm)
November 24, 2020 Filing 100 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Supplement Notice of 28 U.S.C. 1447(B) Compliance re: rec. doc. 99 by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael)
November 11, 2020 Filing 99 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Powell, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Filing 98 Directive of the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk. (dw)
November 3, 2020 Filing 97 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00325. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (dw)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/30/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 94 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Transfer Venue filed on behalf of Plaintiffs and by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael) Modified on 10/30/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 27, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #93 MOTION to Substitute Glenn L. M. Swetman, Christopher O. Massenburg, Jeanette S. Riggins, Natasha A. Corb, Brandie M. Thibodeaux, B. Adam Hays, Megan B. Senter, Amanda L. Deto, Danielle M. Sczesny in place of Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Scott H. Mason, Lauren. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Substitute Glenn L. M. Swetman, Christopher O. Massenburg, Jeanette S. Riggins, Natasha A. Corb, Brandie M. Thibodeaux, B. Adam Hays, Megan B. Senter, Amanda L. Deto, Danielle M. Sczesny in place of Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen as Attorney by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Rand, Kenan) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eldridge Joseph Sanchez. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Galante, Scott) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eldridge Joseph Sanchez. Crescent Materials Service, Inc. waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Galante, Scott) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 90 ANSWER to Petition for Damages by Crescent Materials Service, Inc..(Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 10/22/2020 to edit text (LLH). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 89 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2020. The parties discussed the status of this matter. Mr. Pourciau represented that there will be a joint motion to transfer this matter and will be filed early next week. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crescent Materials Service, Inc. (Adams, Jennifer) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Cross-Claimant, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, against The Travelers Indemnity Company, as an alleged insurer of McDermott Investments, LLC only, be and are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, and reserving unto Huntington Ingalls Incorporated all rights, claims, and causes of action against all other persons and entities, named or not named. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/15/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 86 Notice to Counsel: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel shall dial in to the conference at 888-363-4749, using access code 1799163, 5 minutes prior to the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 85 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Powell, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 84 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2020. The Court determined that it was inappropriate to issue a formal scheduling order until venue has been determined. If an appropriate transfer motion is not filed within 14 days, the Court will set another status conference or order the parties to file an amended status report providing an update to the Court. (KMW) Modified on 9/4/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 83 Notice to Counsel: In light of the projected inclement weather, the Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30AM is RESET for 9/3/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Participants shall dial in to the AT&T Conferencing line at 888-363-4749, using access code 1799163, 5 minutes prior to the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #77 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll and Withdraw Counsel of Record. Attorney Francis Christopher Cannone is enrolled as co-counsel for Defendant OneBeacon America Insurance Company. Attorney Adam deMahy is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER finding as moot #76 Motion to Strike. To the extent attorney Young represented Defendant Crescent Materials Service, Inc. in this matter (see R. Doc. 1-2 at 3), she has been withdrawn and new counsel substituted. (R. Doc. 74). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER finding as moot #75 Motion to Strike. To the extent attorney Young represented Defendant Crescent Materials Service, Inc. in this matter (see R. Doc. 1-2 at 3), she has been withdrawn and new counsel substituted. (R. Doc. 74). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 79 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference. The parties shall dial in to the AT&T Conferencing System at 888-363-4749, using access code 1799163, five minutes prior to the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane, Inc... (Rand, Kenan) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #77 MOTION to Substitute Francis C. Cannone in place of Adam D. deMahy as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Substitute Francis C. Cannone in place of Adam D. deMahy as Attorney by OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Rosamond, Samuel) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #76 MOTION to Strike Previously filed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION to Strike Previously filed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record by Crescent Materials Service, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit text (LLH). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #75 MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Previously Filed #72 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Previously Filed #72 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record by Crescent Materials Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorney Jennifer E. Adams, William C. Harrison, Jr., Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby, and Amber Brianne Barlow are substituted as counsel for Defendant Crescent Materials Service, Inc. replacing Lawrence G. Pugh and Donna M. Young. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 17, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #72 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record Jennifer E. Adams in place of Donna M. Young as Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Plaintiff, Elridge Joseph Sanchez, Jr., against The Travelers Indemnity Company, as an alleged insurer of McDermott Investments, LLC, be and are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, and reserving unto Plaintiff all claims against all others, whether named or unnamed. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/14/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record Jennifer E. Adams in place of Donna M. Young as Attorney by Crescent Materials Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 8/17/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 71 Joint STATUS REPORT by Eldridge Joseph Sanchez. (Galante, Scott) Modified on 8/14/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 70 First MOTION to Dismiss Travelers Indemnity Company Without Prejudice by Eldridge Joseph Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified on 8/14/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. all claims of Plaintiff Elridge Joseph Sanchez and Defendant International Paper Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/10/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Elridge Joseph Sanchez and by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Penn, Elizabeth) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Avondale's Crossclaims by The Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified on 8/6/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Cross-claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Cross-claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Cross-claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by CBS Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/29/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The McCarty Corporation. (Oubre, Louis) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Long, Kelly) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation.. (Long, Kelly) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by Foster Wheeler Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Long, Kelly) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Answer to Original Petition for Damages by CBS Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text.(EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Bowlin, Angela) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Bowlin, Angela) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint by Maryland Casualty Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified on 7/14/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wyeth Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, LLC. (Redmann, David) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #3 Cross-claim by Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc..(Semlinger, Lauren) Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crosby Valve, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Crosby Valve, LLC.. (Bowlin, Angela) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Inc... (St. Julien, Milele) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #3 Cross-claim by Bayer CropScience, Inc..(St. Julien, Milele) Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele) Modified on 7/2/2020 to edit text (LT). Modified on 7/6/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company.. (Wilson, Kristopher) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 43 Notice to Counsel: Considering this matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr., the Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at at 9:30 AM is RESET for 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Status Report remains due on or before 8/13/2020. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff's Original Petition by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Adams, Jennifer) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wyeth Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, LLC.. (Redmann, David) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.. (Melancon, David) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC.. (Porteous, Thomas) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaims of Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 6/26/2020 to edit text (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Adams, Jennifer) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to the #3 Cross-claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/24/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/24/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 33 Letter to Attorney Michael D. Lonegrass regarding Spencer A. Johnson who is Co-Counsel for party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 32 Expert Witness List by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Lonegrass, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 31 Witness List by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Lonegrass, Michael) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 30 Exhibit List by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Lonegrass, Michael) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 29 Request for Notice by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Lonegrass, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Crossclaim by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Lonegrass, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Original Petition for Damages by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc..(Lonegrass, Michael) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by The Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..(Moore, Blaine) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Moore, Blaine) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 23 Answer to #1 Complaint, Answer to #3 Crossclaim by Monsanto Company, Pharmacia, LLC.(Redmann, David) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to the #3 Original Petition for Damages by IDEX Corporation.(Matherne, James) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER and Affirmative to #3 Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claim by IDEX Corporation.(Matherne, James) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross Claim by Grefco, Inc..(Matherne, James) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to the #3 Original Petition for Damages by Grefco, Inc..(Matherne, James) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Romero, Jacqueline) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Romero, Jacqueline) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company.. (Wilson, Kristopher) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jalenak, Jay) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jalenak, Jay) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/11/2020. (KAH) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified on 6/9/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant OneBeacon America Insurance Company's #5 Motion to Strike its incorrectly filed Answer (R. Doc. 4) is GRANTED and Defendant OneBeacon America Insurance Company's Answer (R. Doc. 4) will be struck from the record by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #3 Crossclaims by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Warren Pumps LLC.(Porteous, Thomas) Modified on 6/8/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Lonegrass, Michael) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Pharmacia, LLC, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Melancon, David) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 4 Answer to Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 4 Answer to Complaint by OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosamond, Samuel) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD ANSWER to Complaint by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified on 6/10/2020 STRICKEN as ordered (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Request for Jury Trial, CROSS-CLAIMS against Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, CSR, Limited, Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Monsanto Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/2/2020 to edit text. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneBeacon America Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited, Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc. for OneBeacon America Insurance Company.. (Rosamond, Samuel) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 695862. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2119799), filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Transcript of Sanchez, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Norman Hall, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment State Court Record Part 1, #6 Attachment State Court Record Part 2)(Melancon, David) [Transferred from lamd on 11/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEX Corporation
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Darryl J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps IPG, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Plywood Corporation
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Kenan Slade Rand, Jr
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: David Edmund Redmann, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerical Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Lonegrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster Co
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Materials Service Inc
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morril
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Champion International Corp.
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: David Edmund Redmann, Jr.
Represented By: Darryl J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Westinghouse Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Lonegrass
Represented By: Spencer Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elridge Joseph Sanchez, Jr
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?