Henry et al v. Maxum Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: James Fairchild, Roy Verrett, Jr, Christine Duplantis, Michael Leboeuf, Herman McElroy, Roddy Duplantis, Pamela Lyons, Brandon Henry, Dwayne Deroche, Allen Kaluza, Eric Hebert, Farren Naquin, Calvin Smith, Travis Price, Leonard Holcomb, Staci Authement, Don Giroir, Keith Bonvillain, Susan Ordoyne, Daniel Blanchard and Jessi Marcel
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation, Rueb & Motta APLC, The Nicks Law Firm LLC, Maxum Indemnity Company, Allied World Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations APC, Joseph A Motta Attorney At Law APLC, The Rueb Law Firm APLC, Shantrell Nicks, Joseph A. Motta, Gregory D. Rueb, Howard L. Nations, Rueb Law Firm, APLC, Howard L. Nations, APC, Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. and Nicks Law Firm, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Darren Pitre, Eugene Andras, Brett Bascle, Dean Richard, Troy Pellegrin, Gordon Rose, Mark Savoie, Maloy Guilbeau, Marcy Trahan, Thomas Tegart, Gary Pierce, Charles Billiot, Jr, Jessica Dufrene and Lloyd Cancienne, Jr
Consolidated Defendant: Nicks Law Firm LLC, Rueb & Motta, APLC and Allied World Assurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02995
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Status Conference set for 2/22/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 8/9/2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #67 MOTION for More Definite Statement. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Joseph A Motta Attorney At Law APLC, Joseph A. Motta. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: All Cases)(Lauve, Tyffani) Modified text on 12/29/2020 (jeg). Responses due by 1/18/2021. (mmv).
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting as unopposed #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The submission dates on the Motions to Sever (R. Docs. 38 & 43) are hereby RESET for January 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/28/20. (Reference: 20-cv-2997, 20-cv-2998)(fmm)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #62 Motion is GRANTED. Tyffani A. Lauve shall be enrolled as additional counsel of record for Joseph A. Motta, Attorney at Law, APLC and Joseph A. Motta in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/21/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
December 21, 2020 Filing 64 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #62 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tyffani A. Lauve. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 63 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Sever , #43 MOTION to Sever by Eugene Andras, Staci Authement, Brett Bascle, Charles Billiot, Jr, Daniel Blanchard, Keith Bonvillain, Lloyd Cancienne, Jr, Dwayne Deroche, Christine Duplantis, Roddy Duplantis, Don Giroir, Eric Hebert, Brandon Henry, Leonard Holcomb, Allen Kaluza, Pamela Lyons, Jessi Marcel, Herman McElroy, Susan Ordoyne, Darren Pitre, Travis Price, Dean Richard, Gordon Rose, Mark Savoie, Calvin Smith, Thomas Tegart, Marcy Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 20-2995 and 20-2997)(Breaux, Richard)
December 21, 2020 Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tyffani A. Lauve by Joseph A Motta Attorney At Law APLC, Joseph A. Motta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Capitelli, Brian) Modified text/case reference on 12/21/2020 (jeg).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting as unopposed #55 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The submission dates on the Motion for More Definite Statement (R. Doc. 33) and the Motions for More Definite Statement and Motions to Strike (R. Docs. 42 & 46) are RESET for January 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/21/20. (Reference: 20-2997, 20-2998)(fmm)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting as unopposed #58 Motion to Continue Submission Date. The submission date on the Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses (R. Doc. 56) is RESET for January 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/21/20. (Reference: 20-2997, 20-2998)(fmm)
December 18, 2020 Filing 59 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #58 Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date. **1.Filing attorney did not enter Landmark American Insurance Company, and QBE Insurance Corporation as additional filers in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary. 2.Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 56. 3.In Consolidated Matters, the caption must include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and the same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 18, 2020 Filing 58 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue Submission Date of #56 MOTION to Strike by Maxum Indemnity Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, and QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (jeg).
December 14, 2020 Filing 57 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #56 MOTION to Strike Insufficient Defenses. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 11, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Insufficient Defenses by Eugene Andras, Staci Authement, Brett Bascle, Charles Billiot, Jr, Daniel Blanchard, Keith Bonvillain, Lloyd Cancienne, Jr, Dwayne Deroche, Christine Duplantis, Roddy Duplantis, Don Giroir, Eric Hebert, Brandon Henry, Leonard Holcomb, Allen Kaluza, Pamela Lyons, Jessi Marcel, Herman McElroy, Susan Ordoyne, Gary Pierce, Darren Pitre, Travis Price, Dean Richard, Gordon Rose, Mark Savoie, Calvin Smith, Thomas Tegart, Marcy Trahan. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: All Cases)(Breaux, Richard) Modified text.case references on 12/14/2020 (jeg). Responses due by 12/21/2020 (mmv).
December 11, 2020 Filing 55 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines to file Responses to Motions for a More Definite Statemenet and Motions to Strike (rec docs 33, 42, 46) by Eugene Andras, Staci Authement, Brett Bascle, Charles Billiot, Jr, Daniel Blanchard, Keith Bonvillain, Lloyd Cancienne, Jr, Dwayne Deroche, Christine Duplantis, Roddy Duplantis, Don Giroir, Eric Hebert, Brandon Henry, Leonard Holcomb, Allen Kaluza, Pamela Lyons, Jessi Marcel, Herman McElroy, Susan Ordoyne, Gary Pierce, Darren Pitre, Travis Price, Dean Richard, Gordon Rose, Mark Savoie, Calvin Smith, Thomas Tegart, Marcy Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Breaux, Richard) Modified text on 12/14/2020 (jeg).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Howard L. Nations, APC, Howard L. Nations, Rueb Law Firm, APLC, Cindy L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date on the foregoing Motion is RESET for January 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(fmm)
December 7, 2020 Filing 53 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #50 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1.Filing attorney entered incorrect Corporate parent, is QBE Insurance Group Limited. Correct Corporate parent is QBE Insurance Group Limited. Clerk took corrective action. 2.In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
December 7, 2020 Filing 52 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #47 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #48 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #49 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **In Consolidated Matters, the caption must list all case(s) that are consolidated together and include a separate reference to list the case(s) to which the pleading pertains and that same case number(s) must be referenced in the docket entry. If the caption does not specifically state the case(s) to which the pleading pertains, then all cases will be listed. Please follow this requirement for all future filings.** (Reference: All Cases)(jeg) Modified text on 12/7/2020 (jeg).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Howard L. Nations, APC, Howard L. Nations, Rueb & Motta, APLC, Rueb Law Firm, APLC, Cindy L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Howard L. Nations, APC, Howard L. Nations, Rueb & Motta, APLC, Rueb Law Firm, APLC, Cindy L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission dates on the Motions to Dismiss (R. Docs. 41 & 45) are RESET for January 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(fmm)
December 4, 2020 Filing 50 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by QBE Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent QBE Reinsurance Corporation, Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group Limited for QBE Insurance Corporation (Reference: 20-2995, 20-2997, 20-2998)(Siegel, Robert) Modified Corporate Parents on 12/7/2020 (jeg).
December 4, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition of Damages and First Amended Petition filed by Gary Pierce by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Reference: All Cases)(Siegel, Robert) Modified text/case reference on 12/7/2020 (jeg).
December 4, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition of Damages and First Amended Petition filed by Charles Billiot, Jr., et al by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Reference: All Cases)(Siegel, Robert) Modified text/case reference on 12/7/2020 (jeg).
December 4, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition of Damages and First Amended Petition filed by Brandon Henry et al by QBE Insurance Corporation.(Reference: All Cases)(Siegel, Robert) Modified text/case reference on 12/7/2020 (jeg).
December 4, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike by Shantrell Nicks(20-2998, Doc. 40), Nicks Law Firm LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2998) Responses Due by 12/21//2020. (Originally filed in 20-2998 at Rec. Doc. 32)(ko)
December 4, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, APLC, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Reference: 20-2998) Responses due by 02/01/2021. (Originally filed in 20-2998 at Rec. Doc. 31)(ko)
December 4, 2020 Filing 44 RE-NOTICE of Hearing. The call-in scheduling conference regarding these matters is reset for 12/29/2020 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
December 4, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Sever by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, APLC, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2997) Responses Due 12/21/2020. (Originally filed in 20-2997 at Rec. Doc. 36)(ko)
December 4, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike by Shantrell Nicks, Nicks Law Firm LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 20-2997) Responses Due 12/21/2020. (Originally filed in 20-2997 at Rec. Doc. 32)(ko)
December 4, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb & Motta, APLC, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Affidavit)(Reference: 20-2997) Responses Due 02/01/2021. (Originally filed in 20-2997 at Rec. Doc. 30)(ko)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #34 Motion is GRANTED as modified and the following civil matters are CONSOLIDATED: Civ. A. No. 20-2995, Henry, et al. v.Maxum Indemnity Company, et al., and Civ. A. No. 20-2997, Billiot, et al. v. Maxum Indemnity Company, et al., and Civ. A. No. 20-2998, Pierce v. Maxum Indemnity Company, et al. The foregoing matters are consolidated for all purposes, including trial, unless and until the Court grants a request for severance of any issues or for a separate trial for any plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the separate scheduling conferences set in the three foregoing matters on December 29, 2020 are CANCELLED and RESET for December 29, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/03/2020.(ko)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #36 Motion to Dismiss Party is GRANTED. All of Plaintiffs' claims against defendant, Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, improperly named as Allied World Insurance Company, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiffs' claims against the other defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/3/2020. (jeg)
December 2, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Sever by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Burnthorn, Judy) Responses due by 12/21/2020 (mmv).
December 2, 2020 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiffs' Petition and First Amended Petition by Maxum Indemnity Company.(Schmeeckle, Seth)
December 2, 2020 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Allied World by Staci Authement, Daniel Blanchard, Keith Bonvillain, Dwayne Deroche, Christine Duplantis, Roddy Duplantis, James Fairchild, Don Giroir, Eric Hebert, Brandon Henry, Leonard Holcomb, Jessi Marcel, Herman McElroy, Farren Naquin, Susan Ordoyne, Travis Price, Calvin Smith, Roy Verrett, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Block, Jerald)
December 2, 2020 Filing 35 RE-NOTICE of Hearing. The call-in scheduling conference is reset for 12/29/2020 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice. (mmv)
December 2, 2020 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Consolidate Cases for the Limited Consolidation and Request that a Single Scheduling Conference be Set by Landmark American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fagan, George) Modified text on 12/3/2020 (jeg).
December 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Shantrell Nicks, Nicks Law Firm, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(McGoey, Patrick) Responses due by 12/21/2020 (mmv).
November 24, 2020 Filing 32 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Main Document filed on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg)
November 23, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Rinardo, Joanne) (Main Document 31 replaced on 11/24/2020) (jeg). Responses due by 2/1/2021 (mmv).
November 23, 2020 Filing 30 **DEFICIENT** Request by Landmark American Insurance Company for Single Scheduling Conference on 12-3-2020 (Fagan, George) Modified on 11/24/2020 (jeg).
November 23, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages and First Amended Petition by Landmark American Insurance Company.(Sirera, Sara) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (jeg).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #26 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company shall have until December 10, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/23/20. (fmm)
November 20, 2020 Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Maxum Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Maxum Indemnity Company for Maxum Indemnity Company (Farmer, Jay)
November 19, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Joint Petition for Damages & Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharer, Janelle)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Howard L. Nations, Cindy Nations, Howard Nations, APC, Gregory D. Rueb, and The Rueb Law Firm, APLC shall have until November 23, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/19/20. (fmm)
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Nicks Law Firm, LLC (McGoey, Patrick)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Howard L. Nations, APC, Cindy L. Nations, Howard L. Nations, Gregory D. Rueb, Rueb Law Firm, APLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnthorn, Judy)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Notice of Compliance. **FIling attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Statement of Corporate Disclosures. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and adding Corporate Parents. Please use correct event for future pleadings.** (jeg)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. QBE Insurance Company shall have until December 6, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/17/20. (fmm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosures filed by Landmark American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RSUI Indemnity Company; Corporate Parent RSUI Group Inc.; Corporate Parent Alleghany Insurance Holdings, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation for Landmark American Insurance Company. (Sirera, Sara) Modified text/event on 11/17/2020 (jeg).
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Compliance by Landmark American Insurance Company re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Part 1 of 4, #2 State Court Pleadings Part 2 of 4, #3 State Court Pleadings Part 3 of 4, #4 State Court Pleadings Part 4 of 4)(Sirera, Sara)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Landmark American Insurance Company shall have until November 23, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/16/20. (fmm)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition for Damages) by Landmark American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sirera, Sara) Modified text/linkage on 11/16/2020 (jeg).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to L.R. 7.8, The Nicks Law Firm and Shantrell Nicks shall have until December 2, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/12/20. (fmm)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to L.R. 7.8, Maxum Indemnity Company shall have until December 2, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/12/20. (fmm)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company shall have until November 19, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/12/20. (fmm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal- Petition for Damages by Shantrell Nicks, Nicks Law Firm, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.8 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(McGoey, Patrick) Modified text/linkage on 11/12/2020 (jeg).
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal- Petition for Damages by Maxum Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.8 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Farmer, Jay) Modified text on 11/12/2020 (jeg).
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Joint Petition for Damages & Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharer, Janelle)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 12/3/2020 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING DUE TO RELATED PROCEEDING. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/6/2020.(mm) (NEF: MJ 1)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Related Case(s). **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice by Landmark American Insurance Company, Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Maxum Indemnity Company, QBE Insurance Corporation of related case(s) 2:19-cv-10356; 2:20-cv-02998; 2:20-cv-02997. (Sirera, Sara) Modified filers on 11/6/2020 (mm).
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Landmark American Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, case number 188994 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8580999) filed by Landmark American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Affidavit Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Sara Grace Sirera added to party Landmark American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Sirera, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. Maxum Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Robert I. Siegel
Represented By: Alistair Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rueb & Motta APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nicks Law Firm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxum Indemnity Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Jay P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara Grace Sirera
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy L. Nations
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard L. Nations APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Motta Attorney At Law APLC
Represented By: Brian J. Capitelli
Represented By: Tyffani Amber Lauve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rueb Law Firm APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantrell Nicks
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Motta
Represented By: Brian J. Capitelli
Represented By: Tyffani Amber Lauve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rueb Law Firm, APLC
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard L. Nations, APC
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Represented By: Michael A. Balascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicks Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fairchild
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Verrett, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Duplantis
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leboeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman McElroy
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roddy Duplantis
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lyons
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Henry
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Deroche
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kaluza
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hebert
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farren Naquin
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Smith
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Price
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Holcomb
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Authement
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Giroir
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bonvillain
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ordoyne
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Blanchard
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessi Marcel
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darren Pitre
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eugene Andras
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brett Bascle
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dean Richard
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Troy Pellegrin
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gordon Rose
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mark Savoie
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maloy Guilbeau
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcy Trahan
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Thomas Tegart
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gary Pierce
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Billiot, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessica Dufrene
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lloyd Cancienne, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Marie Lambert
Represented By: Matthew Paul Hymel
Represented By: Richard C. Breaux
Represented By: Jerald P. Block
Represented By: Kendall J. Krielow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nicks Law Firm LLC
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Rueb & Motta, APLC
Represented By: Judy Lynn Burnthorn
Represented By: Joanne Rinardo
Represented By: Zachary Stokes Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Allied World Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?