Adams v. Lakeview Medical Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Virginia M. Adams
Defendant: Lakeview Medical Center LLC A Campus of Tulane Medical Center doing business as Lakeview Regional Medical Center, Columbia/HCA of New Orleans, Inc. incorrectly identified by Plaintiff as Lakeview Regional Medical Center, LLC doing business as Lakeview Regional Medical Center and University Healthcare System, L.C. successor in interest to Lakeview Medical Center, LLC, incorrectly identified as Lakeview Medical Center LLC d/b/a Lakeview Regional Medical Center, a Campus of Tulane Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv03030
Filed: November 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion filed by Virginia M. Adams. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 6) is hereby reset to January 27, 2021 without oral argument. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/4/21.(cg)
January 1, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion by Virginia M. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farrugia, Victor)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Lakeview Medical Center LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Leslie Weill Ehret added to party Lakeview Medical Center LLC(pty:dft).(Ehret, Leslie)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants may file their responsive pleadings no later than December 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/24/20. (cg)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Lakeview Medical Center LLC. Attorney Leslie Weill Ehret added to party Lakeview Medical Center LLC(pty:dft).(Ehret, Leslie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (cg).
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lakeview Medical Center LLC. (cg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
November 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Virginia Adams (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8585800) filed by Virginia Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Victor Roma Farrugia added to party Virginia Adams(pty:pla).(Farrugia, Victor) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/9/2020) (cg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/9/2020) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Lakeview Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia M. Adams
Represented By: Victor Roma Farrugia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Medical Center LLC A Campus of Tulane Medical Center doing business as Lakeview Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia/HCA of New Orleans, Inc. incorrectly identified by Plaintiff as Lakeview Regional Medical Center, LLC doing business as Lakeview Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Katherine Charlotte Kovach
Represented By: Leslie Weill Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Healthcare System, L.C. successor in interest to Lakeview Medical Center, LLC, incorrectly identified as Lakeview Medical Center LLC d/b/a Lakeview Regional Medical Center, a Campus of Tulane Medical Center
Represented By: Katherine Charlotte Kovach
Represented By: Leslie Weill Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?