Hitsbourg LLC v. Keller et al
Plaintiff: Hitsbourg LLC
Defendant: Leah Keller, Ryan Keller, Hunter Plake and Church on a Mission
Case Number: 2:2020cv03343
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS ORDERED that the claims against the Keller defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right, upon good cause shown, within a reasonable time, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/27/2021. (cwa)
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Dismiss Party. Clerk took corrective action. (2) Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. (3) Proposed Order should be added as a separate attachment to the motion and not as part of the motion. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (cwa)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party without Prejudice as to Leah Keller, Ryan Keller, Church on a Mission by Hitsbourg LLC. (Hass, Maximilian) (Main Document 15 replaced on 1/27/2021) (cwa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (cwa). Modified text/event on 1/27/2021 (cwa).
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE OF TO THE CLERK by Church on a Mission, Leah Keller, Ryan Keller (Deas, Destiny)
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Waiver of Service Executed. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Waiver of Service. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hunter Plake on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/17/2021. (Hass, Maximilian) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/13/2021) (cwa).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Church on a Mission answer due 1/26/2021; Leah Keller answer due 1/26/2021; Ryan Keller answer due 1/26/2021. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/5/2021. (cwa)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. 1) Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. 2) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. 3) Document does not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section I and Magistrate (5). (cwa)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Church on a Mission, Leah Keller, Ryan Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Destiny Deas added to party Church on a Mission(pty:dft), Attorney Destiny Deas added to party Leah Keller(pty:dft), Attorney Destiny Deas added to party Ryan Keller(pty:dft).(Deas, Destiny) Modified text/linkage on 1/4/2021 (cwa).
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Church on a Mission served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hass, Maximilian) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (mm).
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Leah Keller served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hass, Maximilian) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (mm).
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Ryan Keller served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hass, Maximilian) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (mm).
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Official Copyright Registration Certificate by Hitsbourg LLC re #1 Complaint. (Hass, Maximilian) Modified text on 12/14/2020 (cwa).
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Church on a Mission, Leah Keller, Ryan Keller, Hunter Plake. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lt)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Form AO 121. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom and should be flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. (lt)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8633360) filed by Hitsbourg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Hunter Plake, #3 Summons - Kellers, #4 Summons - Church on a Mission, #5 Form AO 121 - Copyright Notice, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P, #22 Exhibit Q, #23 Exhibit R, #24 Exhibit S, #25 Exhibit T, #26 Exhibit U) Attorney Maximilian Thomas Hass added to party Hitsbourg LLC(pty:pla).(Hass, Maximilian) Modified text on 12/9/2020 (lt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2020) (lt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/9/2020) (lt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/9/2020) (lt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/9/2020) (lt). (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/9/2020) (lt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #27 AO 121) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitsbourg LLC v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Keller
Represented By: Destiny Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Keller
Represented By: Destiny Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Plake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church on a Mission
Represented By: Destiny Deas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hitsbourg LLC
Represented By: Maximilian Thomas Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?