Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America v. Maximized Marketing, LLC
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America and Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Defendant: Maximized Marketing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03454
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen M. Dorvee. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen M. Dorvee (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8737608) by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Clark, William) Modified text on 2/18/2021 (am).
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Maximized Marketing, LLC on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Clark, William)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Maximized Marketing, LLC. (lt)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America (Clark, William)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Maximized Marketing, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8658357) filed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America(pty:pla).(Clark, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2020: #7 AO 121) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America v. Maximized Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximized Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corp of America
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Represented By: Stephen M. Dorvee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?