M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation v. GoDaddy.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC, Unidentified Parties, Catherine Coleman and Praveen Syal
Case Number: 2:2021cv00108
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Entry of Default as to Praveen Syal. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/10/2021. (cc Defendant at last known address) (ko)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Entry of Default as to Catherine Coleman. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/10/2021. (cc Defendant at last known address)(ko)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Praveen Syal by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Patron, David)
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Catherine Coleman by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Patron, David)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Praveen Syal by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Patron, David) Modified text on 3/9/2021 (mm).
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Catherine Coleman by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Patron, David) Modified text on 3/9/2021 (mm).
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by James H. Gilbert of Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Summons served on Praveen Syal on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gilbert, James) Modified on 2/24/2021 (bm).
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by James H. Gilbert of Complaint, First Amended Complaint, and Summons served on Catherine Coleman on 2/2/2021, answer due 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gilbert, James) Modified on 2/24/2021 (bm).
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Catherine Coleman, Praveen Syal. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Praveen Syal, Catherine Coleman filed by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(pp)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 2/1/2021. (pp)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading First Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 3, #6 Summons Praveen Syal, #7 Summons Catherine Coleman)(Patron, David)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is granted as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/21/2021.(ko)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; GoDaddy.com, LLC served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (Patron, David)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GoDaddy.com, LLC. (mm)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.** (mm)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons and civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Patron, David)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8691703) filed by M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney David Patron added to party M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation(pty:pla).(Patron, David) Modified text on 1/19/2021 (mm). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/19/2021) (mm). (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/19/2021) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation v. GoDaddy.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M S Benbow and Associates Professional Engineering Corporation
Represented By: David Patron
Represented By: James H. Gilbert
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Reda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praveen Syal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?