PH Holdings, LLC v Mompoint et al
Plaintiff: PH Holdings, LLC and PH Holdings, L.L.C.
Defendant: Daniel Mompoint, United States of America and Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2021cv00157
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #15 Motion for Interpleader Deposit is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court for the 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, is authorized and directed to deposit the interpleader funds in the amount of $205,889.19, related to that Court's Docket No. 812-612, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/24/2021. (jeg)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . **Filing attorney did not enter Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana, Daniel Mompoint, and PH Holdings, LLC as additional filers in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Transfer Funds and Deposit into Federal Registry by United States of America, Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana, Daniel Mompoint, and PH Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Forrest) Modified text/filers on 3/24/2021 (jeg).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/22/2021. (jeg)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Christopher Brault as Attorney of Record by Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Aaron)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Status Conference set for 5/28/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Bench Trial set for 11/2/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 8/16/2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jeg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Young, Forrest) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (lt).
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 3/18/2021 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana.(Long, Aaron) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (lt).
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with 28 USC 1447(b) by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 24th JDC Docket)(Young, Forrest) Modified text on 2/8/2021 (lt).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal is GRANTED. The United States is granted an additional twenty-one days in which to file a responsive pleading in this matter. The United States' responsive pleading shall be due on or before February 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/28/2021. (jeg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **1.Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. 2.Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 3.Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal (Petition for Damages) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Forrest) Modified text/referral/exparte/linkage on 1/28/2021 (jeg).
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States of America. (lt)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number No. 812-612, Div. P (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 24th JDC Concursus Petition by PH Holdings LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Forrest) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PH Holdings, LLC v Mompoint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mompoint
Represented By: John A. E. Davidson
Represented By: Christopher J. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Katherine Kaufman
Represented By: Forrest Young
Represented By: Forrest T. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Revenue and Taxation for the State of Louisiana
Represented By: Aaron D. Long
Represented By: Antonio Charles Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Barry H. Grodsky
Represented By: Jennifer R Herbert
Represented By: Alvin John Herbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Barry H. Grodsky
Represented By: Jennifer R Herbert
Represented By: Alvin John Herbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?