United States of America v. Jackson, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mario Alexander, Leroi Gorman Jackson, Mario Alexander Individually and doing business as Taxman Financial Services, LLC and Leroi Gorman Jackson Individually and doing business as Taxman Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00191
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #14 Order. (Weisberg, Andrew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Affidavit of Service. Clerk took corrective action. (bm)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service; Leroi Gorman Jackson served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Weisberg, Andrew) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (bm).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Default as to Mario Alexander. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/12/2021. (ko)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mario Alexander. **Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Executed. **1. Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R and Magistrate (5).** (mm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mario Alexander by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Timothy B. Couch, #2 Proposed Order)(Weisberg, Andrew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mario Alexander served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Timothy B. Couch)(Weisberg, Andrew) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (mm).
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mario Alexander by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit-Certificate of Service)(Weisberg, Andrew) Modified text on 3/9/2021 (mm).
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Affidavit of Service. **For future filings, please note that summons returned executed is an available event to use and will calculate the answer due date. Your filing should have stated that Mario Alexander was served on 2/10/2021; answer due 3/3/2021.** (mm)
February 27, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Timothy B. Couch of Complaint and Summons served on Mario Alexander on 2/10/2021; answer due 3/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Affidavit of Service and Service Report)(Weisberg, Andrew) Modified text/updated answer due date on 3/1/2021 (mm).
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENT. AFFIDAVIT of Service by Timothy B. Couch of Summons and Complaint served on Mario Alexander on February 10, 2021. (Weisberg, Andrew) Modified on 2/24/2021 (bm).
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mario Alexander, Leroi Gorman Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice of Appearance. **Document filed in error. Attorney was already added to the case from the complaint filed.** (mm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Weisberg on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Andrew Joseph Weisberg added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Weisberg, Andrew) Modified text on 2/1/2021 (mm).
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) Attorney Mary Elizabeth Smith added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Smith, Mary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2021) (bm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/1/2021) (bm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/1/2021) (bm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jackson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroi Gorman Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Alexander Individually and doing business as Taxman Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroi Gorman Jackson Individually and doing business as Taxman Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?