Falcone v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Henry Nuncio Falcone, Kathleen B Falcone and Anton Falcone
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Viking Pump, Inc., Grefco, Inc., Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Anadarko US Offshore, LLC, Callon Petroleum Company, Goulds Pumps, The McCarty Corporation, Crane Co., Anco Insulations Inc, SSX, L.C., John Crane Inc, ViacomCBS Inc, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, ConocoPhillips Company, BP Corporation North America, Inc., General Electric Company, United Bulk Terminals Davant, L.L.C., Warren Pumps, LLC, Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc., Production Management Industries, L.L.C., Crown, Cork, and Seal Company, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Walter Oil & Gas Corporation, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, XH, LLC, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Grand Isle Shipyard, L.L.C., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, EPL Oil & Gas, LLC, The Travelers Indemnity Company, CBS Corporation, Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC, United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC, Consol Gas Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Anadarko U.S. Offshore Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, HPC Operating Company, ConocoPhillips Company individually and as successor by merger to Phillips Petroleum Company, Phillips 66 Company, and Drilling Specialties Company doing business as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as D, Gould Pumps LLC, Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Crescent Materials Service Inc, Benjamin Foster Co, Liberty Mutual, Amoco Corporation, Avondale Shipyards, Inc, Electro-Coal Transfer L.L.C., Dominion Exploration & Production, Inc., Louisiana-Hunt Petroleum Corporation, U. S. Plywood Corporation, Amstar Sugar Corporation, Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc., Champion International Corporation, Amchem Products, Inc., Commercial Union Insurance Company, TECO Bulk Terminal LLC, Automatic Power, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, Mobil Oil Corporation, James R. Diefenthal, Edward L. Diefenthal, Energy Partners of Delaware, Ltd., Hunt Petroleum Corporation, EPL Oil & Gas, Inc., Domino Sugar Corporation, Socony Mobil Oil Company, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Avondale Industries, Inc., Tate & Lyle North American Sugars, Incorporated, United Bulk Terminal LLC, CSR Ltd, Exxon Corporation, Grand Isle Shipyard, Inc., CNG Producing Company, Crane Company, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Company, Pipeline Service, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Travelers Indemnity Company, Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., TASR Co, BP Amoco Corporation, Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation, Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC, Viking Pump Inc, Champion International Corp. and Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
Cross Defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company Doc. 79, individually and as successor by merger to Phillips Petroleum Company, Phillips 66 Company, and Drilling Specialties Company doing business as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing busi and U.S. Plywood Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00233
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Sweeney, Craig)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadlines as stated herein. All discovery must be completed by 10/25/2022. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting #358 Motion for Leave to File Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/3/22. (cg)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Ankersen, Brittney)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company identifying Corporate Parent Crane Holdings, Co. for Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 DEFICIENT: NOTICE by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by All Parties. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified on 6/1/2022 (cg).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER - Considering Plaintiffs' Statement of Opposition (Rec. Doc. 318) and pursuant to the Court's Minute Order (Rec. Doc. 310), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 234) filed by Defendant, United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC, is DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 226) filed by Defendant, Grefco, Inc., and the Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 227) filed by Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc., are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/31/22. (cg)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE by John Crane Inc, John Crane Inc Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Corb, Natasha)
May 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE by American Sugar Refining, Inc. Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Matherne, Valerie)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC Statement of Trial Time. (Viator, John)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC re #310 Order on Motion to Continue,, Status Conference,, Set/Reset Hearings, Regarding Statement of Estimated Trial Time. (Reid, Devin)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE by Gould Pumps LLC Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Semlinger, Lauren)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE by Shell Oil Company Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Semlinger, Lauren)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Young, Donna)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE by Crane Company Good Faith Estimate of Time Needed for Trial. (Romero, Jacqueline)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, ViacomCBS Inc of Trial Time Proposals. (Hainkel, Roth)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE by BP Corporation North America, Inc. Statement of Trial Time. (Crump, Richard)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Statement of Trial Time of Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC Statement of Trial Time. (Wehlen, Nicholas)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC Statement of Trial Time. (McMahon, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE by Bayer CropScience, Inc. and Union Carbide Corporation Statement of Trial Time . (Foundas, Ernest) Modified on 5/27/2022 (cg).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE by Production Management Industries, L.L.C. Statement of Trial Time . (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia) Modified on 5/27/2022 (cg).
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE by Warren Pumps, LLC Statement of Trial Time. (Oser, Daniel)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE by SSX, L.C. Statement of Trial Time. (Klundt, Beverly)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. Statement of Trial Time. (Klundt, Beverly)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE by Travelers Indemnity Company Good Faith Estimate of Time Needed for Trial. (Wilson, Kristopher)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. Statement of Trial Time. (Sweeney, Craig)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated Estimate of Time Needed for Trial. (Melancon, David)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE by International Paper Company Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Penn, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE by Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC Statement of Trial Time. (Ziffer, Lee)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Ankersen, Brittney)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Zurich American Insurance Company / Statement of Requested Trial Time. (Kemmerly, McNeil)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. of Statement of Trial Time Needed. (McCormick, John)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company Ex Parte Statement of Trial Time. (Cosculluela, Alex)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Summons Issued as to Gould Pumps LLC, Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Request of Summons Issued as to Gould Pumps LLC, Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc., Shell Oil Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #79 Answer to Third Party Complaint(Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/23/2022 (cg).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (cg)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Liberty Mutual.(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (cg).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc re #322 Answer to Crossclaim,,,. (Ankersen, Brittney)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ANSWER to #79 Answer to Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and CROSSCLAIM against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Hopeman Brothers Inc.(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (cg).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #320 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document contains incorrect Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section J, Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North (5). (lw)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Liberty Mutual.(Ankersen, Brittney)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Response/Reply by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC to #318 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Statement of Opposition. (McMahon, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Statement of Opposition by Anton Falcone, Kathleen B Falcone. (Galante, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Statement of Trial Time on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Anton Falcone, Kathleen B Falcone. (Galante, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #314 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Metropolitan Life be, and is hereby, dismissed, without prejudice, in the above captioned matter, with each party to bear their own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated against United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC only, is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/5/22. (cg)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crossclaim Defendant United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/4/2022 (cg).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by Kathleen B. Falcone, Anton Falcone, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 5/4/2022 (cg).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Sugar Refining, Inc..(Matherne, Valerie)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Damages and Wrongful Death by Hopeman Brothers Inc.(Ankersen, Brittney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Carl Barbier: Status Conference held on 4/29/2022. Motion to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Rec. Doc. 212) is GRANTED. The jury trial is RESET to February 6, 2023 at 8:30a.m. and the pre-trial conference is RESET to January 6, 2023 at 9:30a.m. (cg)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint by Crane Company.(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/2/2022 (cg).
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by ConocoPhillips Company.(Cosculluela, Alex)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Bayer CropScience, Inc..(Foundas, Ernest)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Union Carbide Corporation.(Foundas, Ernest)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation.(Maestri, Walter)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by SSX, L.C..Attorney Beverly M. Klundt added to party SSX, L.C.(pty:dft).(Klundt, Beverly)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C..(Klundt, Beverly)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Production Management Industries, L.L.C..(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING #292 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Callon Petroleum Company be, and is hereby, dismissed, without prejudice, from the cross-claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/27/2022. (pp)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC.(McMahon, Michael)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by International Paper Company, International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC.(Reid, Devin)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/27/2022 (lw).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by BP Corporation North America, Inc..(Crump, Richard)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC.(Ziffer, Lee)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC.Attorney Donna M. Young added to party Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC(pty:dft).(Young, Donna)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Callon Petroleum Company by Callon Petroleum Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (McCormick, John)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #260 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Tyson B. Shofstahl and Leslie M. Henry of Adams and Reese LLP hereby are enrolled as additional counsel of record for ConocoPhillips Company in this matter. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/25/22. (cg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Witness and Exhibit List by XH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Viator, John)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Witness and Exhibit List by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Viator, John)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Witness and Exhibit List by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC. (Reid, Devin)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Exhibit List by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Witness List by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Exhibit List by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Witness and Exhibit List by Shell Oil Company. (Semlinger, Lauren)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Exhibit List by Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC. (Ziffer, Lee)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Witness List by General Electric Company. (Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Witness List by Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC. (Ziffer, Lee)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Exhibit List by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D)(Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Witness List by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Hainkel, Roth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Witness and Exhibit List by Gould Pumps LLC. (Semlinger, Lauren)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC.(Kennedy, Samantha)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Witness List by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Melancon, David)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Exhibit List by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Melancon, David)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Witness List by Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Richeson, McGready)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Exhibit List by Bayer CropScience, Inc.. (Richeson, McGready)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Witness List by Union Carbide Corporation. (Richeson, McGready)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Exhibit List by Union Carbide Corporation. (Richeson, McGready)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Exhibit List by BP Corporation North America, Inc.. (Crump, Richard)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Witness List by BP Corporation North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Balzers CV, List of Testimony and List of Publications)(Crump, Richard)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Pourciau, Damon)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Witness List by All Plaintiffs. (Pourciau, Damon)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Witness and Exhibit List by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation, Walter Oil & Gas Corporation. (Maestri, Walter)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Witness and Exhibit List by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC. (Wehlen, Nicholas)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Witness List by Crane Company. (Romero, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC.(Wehlen, Nicholas)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Exhibit List by Crane Company. (Romero, Jacqueline)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tyson B. Shofstahl and Leslie M. Henry as additional counsel for ConocoPhillips Company by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cerise, Charles)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Exhibit List by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Witness List by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Witness and Exhibit List by Grefco, Inc.. (Matherne, James)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Witness and Exhibit List by Viking Pump Inc. (Matherne, James)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Witness and Exhibit List by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual. (Burg, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Witness and Exhibit List by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.. (Sweeney, Craig)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Witness List by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Exhibit List by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Witness and Exhibit List by SSX, L.C.. (Klundt, Beverly)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Witness and Exhibit List by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C.. (Klundt, Beverly)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Witness and Exhibit List by Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kemmerly, McNeil)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Witness and Exhibit List by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C.. (Klundt, Beverly)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Witness List by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Oser, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Exhibit List by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Oser, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Witness and Exhibit List by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC. (McMahon, Michael)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Witness List by ConocoPhillips Company. (Cerise, Charles)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Exhibit List by ConocoPhillips Company. (Cerise, Charles)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Witness List by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jalenak, Jay)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Exhibit List by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jalenak, Jay)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Witness and Exhibit List by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC. (Young, Donna)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Witness List by John Crane Inc, John Crane Inc. (Corb, Natasha)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Exhibit List by John Crane Inc, John Crane Inc. (Corb, Natasha)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Witness List by American Sugar Refining, Inc.. (Matherne, Valerie)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Exhibit List by American Sugar Refining, Inc.. (Matherne, Valerie)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Witness and Exhibit List by Production Management Industries, L.L.C.. (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION for Summary Judgment by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #4 Notice of Submission)(McMahon, Michael)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Witness and Exhibit List by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Wilson, Kristopher)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ANSWER to #221 Amended Complaint, by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual re #212 MOTION for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines. (cg)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #228 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/20/22. (cg)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #212 Motion for Status Conference and to Continue. IT IS ORDERED that the Court will conduct a Status Conference in the courtroom on the 28th day of April, 2022 at 8:30 o'clock a. m to discuss the current status of this matter. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/20/22. (cg)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to The Hopeman Interests' Motion for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Ankersen, Brittney) (Main Document 228 replaced on 4/19/2022) (cg).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Viking Pump Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Notice of Submission)(Matherne, James)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Grefco, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Notice of Submission)(Matherne, James)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #223 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/13/22. (cg)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Anton Falcone, Kathleen B Falcone re #212 MOTION for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines, #214 MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Hopeman Brothers, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Rec. Doc. 212) . (Galante, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Hopeman Brothers, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Rec. Doc. 212) by American Sugar Refining, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Matherne, Valerie)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #218 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Damages and Wrongful Death, #221 Amended Complaint. This case was re-assigned to Judge CARL J. BARBIER. Please fix caption for future pleadings. (cg)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kathleen B Falcone, Anton Falcone.Attorney Damon R. Pourciau added to party Kathleen B Falcone(pty:pla), Attorney Damon R. Pourciau added to party Anton Falcone(pty:pla).(cg)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #218 Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/12/22. (cg)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #217 Motion to Dismiss Party. Callon Petroleum Company is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, in the above-captioned matter with each party to bear their own costs. This case is dismissed against Callon Petroleum Company, its agents and assigns, and all other claims against all other parties, named or unnamed, are expressly reserved. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/12/22. (cg)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Damages and Wrongful Death by Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Pourciau, Damon)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Callon Petroleum Company by Callon Petroleum Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalenak, Jay)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #214 Motion for Joinder. Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, and XH, LLC join and adopt the Motion for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/30/22. (cg)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #213 Motion to Dismiss Party. Anco Insulations, Inc. is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, in the above captioned matter, with each party to bear their own costs. This case is dismissed against Anco Insulations, Inc., its agents and assigns and all other claims against all other entities, named or unnamed, are expressly reserved. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/29/22. (cg)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Hopeman Brothers, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Rec. Doc. 212) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Viator, John)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Anco Insulations, Inc. Without Prejudice by Anco Insulations Inc, Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Shelley) Modified filer/text on 3/29/2022 (lw).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Status Conference and to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (cg).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SUGGESTION OF DEATH by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual as to Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone (Ankersen, Brittney)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Shelley L. Thompson is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant, Crane Co. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/21/22. (cg)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Shelley L. Thompson as Attorney by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Jacqueline)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. John F. McCormick, Rebecca E. Duggan, and Taylor J. Winstead be substituted as co-counsel of record for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., in the place and stead of Peter A. Bourgeois and Christopher A. Meeks. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/15/22. (cg)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #206 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Document contains incorrect Judge. All future pleadings must reflect District Judge Carl J. Barbier. (cg)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John F. McCormick, III to be substituted in place of Peter A. Bourgeois by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Peter)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #204 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Walter Oil & Gas Corporations Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is hereby GRANTED, and that Kari M. Rosamond (#34065) is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/10/22. (cg)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Kari Rosamond as Attorney by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maestri, Walter)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Margaret M. Joffe, Kenan Slade Rand, Jr, Shelley L. Thompson for Anco Insulations Inc. Attorney Etienne Francis Rene; Jamie Hebert Baglio and Douglas R. Elliott terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another section of this Court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/15/2022.(NEF: Case Managers for Sections E and J)(pp)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/14/2022.(jls) (NEF: Section E)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Margaret M. Joffe, Kenan S. Rand, and Shelley L. Thompson to be substituted in place of Jamie H. Baglio, Douglas R. Elliott, and Etienne F. Rene by Anco Insulations Inc, Anco Insulations Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Shelley L. Thompson added to party Anco Insulations Inc(pty:crd), Attorney Shelley L. Thompson added to party Anco Insulations Inc(pty:dft).(Thompson, Shelley)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Connor Harris Fields for Hopeman Brothers Inc and Liberty Mutual. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/18/2022. (lag)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Connor H. Fields as Additional Counsel by Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/13/2022 (jls).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 JOINT PATHOLOGY ORDER, as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/20/2021.(jls)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING #195 Motion for Entry of Pathology Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/15/2021. (jls)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Entry of Joint Pathology Order by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Joint Pathology Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 12/13/2021 (jls).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED #192 Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone. The parties shall meet and confer no later than seven (7) days from the date of this Order to agree on a mutually-agreeable time and place for the deposition. As Pharos also seeks to recover its costs incurred in the filing of its motion, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pharos may, should circumstances so warrant, file the appropriate motion with supporting documentation to recover said costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/9/2021. (jls)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ANSWER to #154 Amended Complaint First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc.(Hainkel, Roth)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule 37 Certificate, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Notice of Submission)(Sweeney, Craig) Modified to add referral on 11/19/2021 (jls).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Oser, Daniel) Modified text on 11/4/2021 (jls).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Liberty Mutual.(Burg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/4/2021 (jls).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Hopeman Brothers Inc.(Burg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/4/2021 (jls).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company identifying The Vanguard Group, Inc. and T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parents for International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified to add corporate parents on 10/28/2021 (jls).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by American Sugar Refining, Inc. (Matherne, Valerie) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (jls).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (jls).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Grefco, Inc. (Matherne, James) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (jls).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Viking Pump Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (jls).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 10/20/2021 (jls).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC.(Lee, Perrey) Modified text on 10/19/2021 (jls).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc. by Production Management Industries, L.L.C. (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia) Modified text on 10/18/2021 (jls).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Production Management Industries, L.L.C. (Diaz-Yaeger, Elia) Modified text on 10/18/2021 (jls).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC.(McMahon, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (jls).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (jls).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (jls).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC.(Reid, Devin) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 **DEFICIENT** ANSWER to 154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. Attorney Samantha Kennedy added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha Kennedy added to party ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha Kennedy added to party XH, LLC(pty:dft).(Kennedy, Samantha) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by SSX, L.C. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by John Crane Inc. (Corb, Natasha) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company. (Cerise, Charles) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Anco Insulations Inc. (Joffe, Margaret) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation. (Rosamond, Kari) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation. (Rosamond, Kari) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (Bourgeois, Peter) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Crane Company. (Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. (Klundt, Beverly) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jls).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC. (Wehlen, Nicholas) Modified text on 10/8/2021 (jls).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 10/8/2021 (jls).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by General Electric Company. (Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 10/8/2021 (jls).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 10/8/2021 (jls).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 10/8/2021 (jls).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 10/7/2021 (jls).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 10/7/2021 (jls).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ANSWER to #154 First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Callon Petroleum Company.(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (jls).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants and Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association filed by Henry Nuncio Falcone.(Galante, Scott) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (jls).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc. with Jury Demand by Callon Petroleum Company.(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (jls).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDERED that this matter is reopened and restored to the Court's trial docket. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint adding the Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association as a defendant on or before Monday, 10/4/2021. If this amendment raises any additional defenses, Defendants are granted leave until Monday, 10/11/2021 to file amended answers. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must complete their Rule 26 initial disclosures within the next seven days. If additional time is required, Defendants must file a motion requesting an extension not to exceed seven days. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/1/2021.(jls)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown: Status Conference held by videoconference on 9/28/2021. (jls)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #146 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Attorney Charles McLeod for BP Corporation North America, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 28, 2021. (mp)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by SSX, L.C., identifying Corporate Parents EMR Financing LLC and EMR (USA Holdings) Inc. for SSX, L.C. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text/added corporate parents on 9/28/2021 (jls).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc. by SSX, L.C. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (jls).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by SSX, L.C. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (jls).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Chan E. McLeod by BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (jls).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER - Considering the ongoing impacts of Hurricane Ida on the region and the recent surge in the Delta variant of COVID-19, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 28, 2021 at 3:00 PM will proceed via videoconference. Counsel will receive a Zoom link from chambers. Only counsel of record may appear at the pretrial conference. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/22/21.(cg)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY by McCarty Corporation (Kohn, Susan)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amber L. Stewart terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/9/2021. (caa)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 9/10/2021 (lw).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING #136 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of Plaintiff Henry Nuncio Falcone against Defendant CSR, LTD. a/k/a CSR, Limited only are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/20/2021. (jls)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING #135 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of Plaintiff Henry Nuncio Falcone against Defendant Crescent Materials Service, Inc. only are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/20/2021. (jls)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING #134 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of Plaintiff Henry Nuncio Falcone against Defendant Consol Gas Company only are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/20/2021. (jls)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #109 Motion to Stay filed by Defendant Lamorak Insurance Company, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for 9/28/2021 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/19/2021. (jls)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #112 Motion for Summary Judgment, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Henry Nuncio Falcon and cross-claimant Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s claims against Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/19/2021. (jls)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to CSR, LTD. a/k/a CSR, Limited by Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified event/text on 7/20/2021 (jls).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Crescent Materials Service, Inc. by Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified event/text on 7/20/2021 (jls).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Consol Gas Company by Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified event/text on 7/20/2021 (jls).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc. by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (jls).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified text on 7/19/2021 (jls).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC identifying Corporate Parents GIS, LLC and GIS Holdings, LLC for Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC. (Thompson, Shelley) Modified to add corporate parents on 7/19/2021 (jls).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Summons Issued as to Edward L. Diefenthal, SSX, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lw)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING #126 Motion to Dismiss Party. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), the claims of Plaintiff Henry Nuncio Falcone against Defendant James R. Diefenthal only are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/13/2021. (pp)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Request of Summons Issued as to Edward L. Diefenthal filed by Henry Nuncio Falcone re #1 Notice of Removal. (Galante, Scott)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Request of Summons Issued as to SSX, L.C. filed by Henry Nuncio Falcone re #1 Notice of Removal. (Galante, Scott)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION/NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to James R. Diefenthal by Henry Nuncio Falcone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galante, Scott) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (lw). Modified event on 7/12/2021 (jls).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2022 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(jrc)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls, Inc., with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text on 7/8/2021 (jls).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parents Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd., and Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified on 7/6/2021 (jls).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (jls).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #115 Motion to Join and Adopt Lamorak's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/29/2021. (jls)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING #119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary M. Langlois, Jr. is withdrawn as counsel of record. Defendant EPL remains represented by Edward B. Poitevent, II, Paul J. Masinter, and Nicholas J. Wehlen. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/29/2021. (jls)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Gary M. Langlois, Jr. as Attorney by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wehlen, Nicholas) Modified text on 6/29/2021 (lw).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING #117 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Attorney Beverly M. Klundt is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/25/2021. (jls)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Beverly M. Klundt by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 6/21/2021 (jls).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. (Radecker, H.) Modified text on 6/21/2021 (jls).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Join and Adopt Lamorak's Motion to Stay by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (mm).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Inc. by Crane Company.(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (bm).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 6/9/2021 (jls).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #4 Exhibit 1)(Bernard, David) Modified text on 6/8/2021 (jls).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc.(Bernard, David) Modified text on 6/7/2021 (bm).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #109 MOTION to Stay . Filing attorney incorrectly changed N to Y at the question, Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N? This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (lt)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Stay by Lamorak Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified text on 6/4/2021 (lt).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2021 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(jrc)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Melancon, David)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Oser, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2021 (lt).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by ViacomCBS Inc.(Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (jls).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Bayer CropScience, Inc.(Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (lt).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. by Union Carbide Corporation.(Foundas, Ernest) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (lt).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (lt).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaims and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company.(Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (lt).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC.(Ziffer, Lee) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (lt).
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaims and Third Party Demands with Jury Demand of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by John Crane Inc.(Corb, Natasha) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (lt).
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #97 Answer to Crossclaim by BP Corporation North America, Inc. **Pleadings on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper'. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jls)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (jls). (Main Document 97 replaced on 4/29/2021) (jls).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim and Third Party Demands of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC.(Reid, Devin) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (lt).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim by American Sugar Refining, Inc.(Matherne, Valerie) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (lt).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (bm).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC.(Langlois, Gary) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (bm).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Notice of Compliance with Service by Henry Nuncio Falcone re #71 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Hartman, Stephanie) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (jls).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC. (Trapani, Paul) Modified text on 4/26/2021 (bm).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #89 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Michael North (5). (bm)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC.(Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 4/23/2021 (bm).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Grefco, Inc. (Matherne, James) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (bm).
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Viking Pump, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (bm).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. (Viator, John) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (jls).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ANSWER to #79 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by ConocoPhillips Company.(Cerise, Charles) Modified text on 4/22/2021 (bm).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ANSWER to #79 Huntington Ingalls Cross-Claims and Third Party Complaint by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (Bourgeois, Peter) Modified text on 4/22/2021 (bm).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal. by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation.(Maestri, Walter)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (bm)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #79 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (bm).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Production Management Industries, L.L.C..Attorney Elia Diaz-Yaeger added to party Production Management Industries, L.L.C.(pty:dft), .(Diaz-Yaeger, Elia) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (bm).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims, Third Party Demand and Request for Jury Trial, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against American Sugar Refining, Inc., Anadarko US Offshore, LLC, Anco Insulations Inc, BP Corporation North America, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C., CSR Ltd, Callon Petroleum Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Consol Gas Company, Crane Company, Crescent Materials Service Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Edward L. Diefenthal, James R. Diefenthal, EPL Oil & Gas, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, General Electric Company, Gould Pumps LLC, Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC, Grefco, Inc., Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, John Crane Inc, Liberty Mutual, McCarty Corporation, Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc., Pipeline Service, Inc., Production Management Industries, L.L.C., SSX, L.C., Shell Oil Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC, ViacomCBS Inc, Viking Pump, Inc., Walter Oil & Gas Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, XH, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (bm).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (jls).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore LLCs, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/31/2021. (caa)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING #74 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Robert T. Vorhoff is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record and Paul D. Palermo, Cynthia Cleland Roth, and Craig V. Sweeney is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for Defendant Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/30/2021. (jls)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 EXPARTE/CONSENT Stipulation and MOTION for Proposed Consent Order by and Between Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore, LLC regarding Anadarko's Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, rec. doc. 56, by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Michael North.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ziffer, Lee) Modified text/removed referral on 3/30/2021 (jls). Referred on 3/31/2021 (jls).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul D. Palermo, Craig V. Sweeney, and Cynthia C. Roth to be substituted in place of Robert Vorhoff by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vorhoff, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DEFICIENT. STIPULATION by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC re 69 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, 58 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk, and filed by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone (Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 DEFICIENT. ANSWER to 1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 3/24/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding service upon defendants Production Management Industries, LLC, CBS Corporation, Consol Gas Company, Crescent Materials Service, Inc., CSR Ltd., Edward L. Diefenthal, James R. Diefenthal, and OneBeacon America Insurance Company: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff show cause on or before 4/23/2021, by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, to report the status thereof or show cause why certain defendants should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/22/2021.(jls)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC (Oser, Daniel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER dismissing as moot #56 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/16/2021. (caa)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc. (Bernard, David) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (jls).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mon-Fab, LLC, Corporate Parent International Pipe Fitters, LLC for Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc. (Bernard, David)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #64 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. **Filing attorney did not enter Bayer CropScience Holding SA and Bayer AG as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation. **Filing attorney did not enter Dow Chemical Company and Dow, Inc. as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parents Bayer CropScience Holding SA and Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified to add corporate parents on 3/9/2021 (jls).
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parents Dow Chemical Company and Dow, Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified to add corporate parents on 3/9/2021 (jls).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that Elia Diaz-Yaeger petition the court for re-admission, substitution or withdrawal on or before 4/3/2021, or show cause on that date by written memorandum why she should not be removed from this case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/4/2021.(jls) (NEF: ediaz-yaeger@lawla.com)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #60 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter BP America Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BP Corporation North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP America Inc. for BP Corporation North America, Inc. (Napolitano, Shelley) Modified to add corporate parent on 3/5/2021 (jls).
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #56 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge.Clerk took corrective action. (bm)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Anadarko US Offshore, LLC (Ziffer, Lee)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/24/2021. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Ziffer, Lee) Modified referral on 3/1/2021 (bm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (bm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (bm).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. is granted an extension of twenty-one (21) days to file responsive pleadings to the Petition filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/25/2021. (jls)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings Inc. for Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (Bourgeois, Peter) Modified text/added corp. parent on 2/24/2021 (jls).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Crane Company. (Romero, Jacqueline) Modified text on 2/24/2021 (jls).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC identifying Corporate Parent Freeport-McMoran Inc. for Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC (Reid, Devin)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by BP Corporation North America, Inc.(Napolitano, Shelley) Modified text on 2/24/2021 (jls).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vorhoff, Robert) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (jls).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (jls).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #44 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Pleading was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (jls)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC.(Reid, Devin) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (jls). (Main Document 44 replaced on 2/22/2021) (jls).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Kinler, Douglas)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by McCarty Corporation.(Kinler, Douglas) Modified text on 2/19/2021 (jls).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ConocoPhillips Company (Cerise, Charles)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Hainkel, Roth)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Hainkel, Roth)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ViacomCBS Inc identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc (Hainkel, Roth)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Sugar Refining, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ASR Group International, Inc. for American Sugar Refining, Inc. (Matherne, Valerie)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Walter Oil & Gas Corporation (Maestri, Walter)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Compliance with L.R. 3.2 by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Viator, John) Modified text on 2/18/2021 (jls).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Host Davant, LLC for United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC. (McMahon, Michael) Modified text/added corporate parent on 2/18/2021 (jls).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. Attorneys Peter Ashley Bourgeois and Christopher Ashley Meeks are hereby enrolled as counsel of record for Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. in place of Michael D. Lonegrass. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/17/2021. (jls)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Peter A. Bourgeois to be substituted in place of Michael D. Lonegrass. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. (bm)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The undersigned United States Magistrate Judge is recused from further participation in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above-captioned case to a Magistrate Judge of this Court other than Division 3. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 2/12/21.(cg)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by John Crane Inc identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group, plc for John Crane Inc (Corb, Natasha)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EX PARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Peter A. Bourgeois, Christopher A. Meeks to be substituted in place of Michael D. Lonegrass by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lonegrass, Michael) Modified text/submission on 2/16/2021 (bm).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC naming Corporate Parent Energy XXI Gulf Coast LLC. (Langlois, Gary) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (bm).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crescent Materials Service Inc (Adams, Jennifer)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C..(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (bm).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C. (Radecker, H.)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Callon Petroleum Company (Jalenak, Jay)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Callon Petroleum Company.(Jalenak, Jay) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (bm).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (jls).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (bm).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by XH, LLC naming Corporate Parents HPC Acquisition Corporation, Corporate Parent XTO Energy, Inc., and Exxon Mobil Corporation for XH, LLC. (Follette, Patrick) Modified on 2/12/2021 (bm).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation naming Corporate Parents Mobil Corporation; Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Follette, Patrick) Modified on 2/12/2021 (bm).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC.(Follette, Patrick) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (bm).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by EPL Oil & Gas, LLC.(Langlois, Gary)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jalenak, Jay)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC.(McMahon, Michael)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 2/9/2021. (NEF: Section G)(sbs)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault RECUSED. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 2/9/2021. (NEF: Mag. 3) (sa)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/9/2021.(cwa)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Documents do not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section I and Magistrate (2). (cwa)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Grefco, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (cwa).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Viking Pump, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (cwa).
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/8/2021. (NEF: Judge Currault)(ajn)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (lt)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2020-10058, F-7 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8721616) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E Part 1 of 5, #7 Exhibit E Part 2 of 5, #8 Exhibit E Part 3 of 5, #9 Exhibit E Part 4 of 5, #10 Exhibit E Part 5 of 5, #11 Notice of Removal to State Court, #12 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties) Attorney John Allain Viator added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Allain Viator added to party ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Allain Viator added to party XH, LLC(pty:dft).(Viator, John) Modified text on 2/8/2021 (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcone v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grefco, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Beverly Klundt Baudouin
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Beverly M. Klundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko US Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callon Petroleum Company
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Tyler Moore Kostal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations Inc
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Etienne Francis Rene
Represented By: Margaret M. Joffe
Represented By: Jamie Hebert Baglio
Represented By: Kenan Slade Rand, Jr
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSX, L.C.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Beverly M. Klundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Danielle M.S. Riera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Represented By: Charles McLeod
Represented By: Shelley Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Bulk Terminals Davant, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Cleland Roth
Represented By: Robert T. Vorhoff
Represented By: Paul D. Palermo
Represented By: Craig V. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Production Management Industries, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elia Diaz-Yaeger
Represented By: Jay P. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork, and Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Gabriel J. Veninata
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Walter P. Maestri
Represented By: Kari M. Rosamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XH, LLC
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Isle Shipyard, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport-McMoran Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Brady McNeil Hadden
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPL Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Edward B. Poitevent, II
Represented By: Paul James Masinter
Represented By: Nicholas J. Wehlen
Represented By: Gary M. Langlois, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Isle Shipyard, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Trapani, III
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Kirk Norris Aurandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko U.S. Offshore Corporation
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelsey Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPC Operating Company
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company individually and as successor by merger to Phillips Petroleum Company, Phillips 66 Company, and Drilling Specialties Company doing business as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as D
Represented By: Alex E. Cosculluela
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie Marie Henry
Represented By: Tyson B. Shofstahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Materials Service Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Amber Barlow Garcia
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster Co
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Connor Harris Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Represented By: Charles McLeod
Represented By: Shelley Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Shipyards, Inc
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro-Coal Transfer L.L.C.
Represented By: Paul R. Trapani, III
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Kirk Norris Aurandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Exploration & Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana-Hunt Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Plywood Corporation
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amstar Sugar Corporation
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Marine Fabricators, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Bernard
Represented By: Anthony John Staines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International Corporation
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECO Bulk Terminal LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Trapani, III
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Kirk Norris Aurandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Power, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Cleland Roth
Represented By: Robert T. Vorhoff
Represented By: Paul D. Palermo
Represented By: Craig V. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Connor Harris Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Diefenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L. Diefenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Partners of Delaware, Ltd.
Represented By: Edward B. Poitevent, II
Represented By: Paul James Masinter
Represented By: Nicholas J. Wehlen
Represented By: Gary M. Langlois, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPL Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. Poitevent, II
Represented By: Paul James Masinter
Represented By: Nicholas J. Wehlen
Represented By: Gary M. Langlois, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino Sugar Corporation
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socony Mobil Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate & Lyle North American Sugars, Incorporated
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Bulk Terminal LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Trapani, III
Represented By: Michael William McMahon
Represented By: Kirk Norris Aurandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Corporation
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Patrick R Follette
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Thomas Clay Naquin
Represented By: Patrick Hayes Hunt
Represented By: Samantha Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Isle Shipyard, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNG Producing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Company
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Lonegrass
Represented By: Peter Ashley Bourgeois
Represented By: Christopher Ashley Meeks
Represented By: John F. McCormick, III
Represented By: Rebecca Elaine Duggan
Represented By: Taylor Joseph Winstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASR Co
Represented By: Valerie Theng Matherne
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Represented By: Charles McLeod
Represented By: Shelley Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko U.S. Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion International Corp.
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Nuncio Falcone
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen B Falcone
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Falcone
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ConocoPhillips Company Doc. 79, individually and as successor by merger to Phillips Petroleum Company, Phillips 66 Company, and Drilling Specialties Company doing business as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing busi
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: Alex E. Cosculluela
Represented By: Leslie Marie Henry
Represented By: Tyson B. Shofstahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: U.S. Plywood Corporation
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?