St. James Parish School Board v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: St. James Parish School Board
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Anda, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan Limited, Indivior Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Noramco, Inc., H. D. Smith, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, Cephalon, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp, Walmart, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Allergan USA, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Actavis Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals, U.S.A., Inc., Allergan plc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Salt Lake City, Impax Laboratories, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Watson Pharma, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Florida
Case Number: 2:2021cv00313
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (pp)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(mm)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kippers, Shannon) Modified text/event on 3/1/2021 (mm).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to McKesson Corporation answer due 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2021. (ko)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/24/2021. (NEF: Section T)(sbs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text, added link on 2/24/2021 (sbs).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by St. James Parish School Board. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) Modified txt on 2/23/2021 (ajn).
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 40174 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8732823) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Petition)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. James Parish School Board v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Russell Reginald Dickson
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: S. Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Represented By: John Francis Olinde
Represented By: Peter Joseph Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Limited
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Kippers
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mac Dougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Salt Lake City
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Florida
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: C. Wm. Bradley, Jr
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. James Parish School Board
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Bruce G. Mohon
Represented By: Matthew Landry
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?