United States of America v. Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Land and Antoinette Bernice Cognevich Barrois
Case Number: 2:2021cv00315
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 lc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking, #2 Order for Delivery of Possession)(Schreiber, Glenn)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Order for Delivery of Possession. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 2/25/2021. (sbs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order for Delivery of Possession by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified text on 2/24/2021 (sbs).
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 Receipt of Check by United States of America (Schreiber, Glenn)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order for Deposit and Investment of Funds in Registry of Court. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Louisiana, deposit United States Treasury Check No. 8736-01862764 in the registry of the Court and the said Clerk invest said sum in an interest bearing account until such time as it is withdrawn from the registry of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 2/18/2021. (NEF: Financial) (sbs)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order for Deposit and Investment of Funds in Registry of Court by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (sbs).
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules A-G)(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (sbs).
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Declaration of Taking by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules A-G)(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (sbs).
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Glenn Kenneth Schreiber added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Schreiber, Glenn) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Bernice Cognevich Barrois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Glenn Kenneth Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?