AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC et al v. Fischbein
Plaintiff: Jill Johnson Bouvier and AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC
Defendant: Brenda P. Fischbein
Case Number: 2:2021cv00318
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Brenda P. Fischbein on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Arbour, Tyler)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXTENDED RICO STANDING ORDER DEADLINE: IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall have an additional sixty (60) days from the entry of this order to file a RICO case statement (an original and one (1) copy). The statement shall include the facts as outlined in the original Standing Order (R. Doc. 5). Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/09/2021. (ko)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File RICO Case Statement by AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tucker, Ryan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Rico Standing Order. By Clerk.(ko)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brenda P. Fischbein. (pp)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Brenda P. Fischbein filed by AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC, Jill Johnson Bouvier re #1 Complaint,. (Arbour, Tyler) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/16/2021) (pp).
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Brenda P. Fischbein (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8733288) filed by AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC, Jill Johnson Bouvier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Tyler John Arbour added to party AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler John Arbour added to party Jill Johnson Bouvier(pty:pla).(Arbour, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC et al v. Fischbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Johnson Bouvier
Represented By: Tyler John Arbour
Represented By: Ryan Michael Tucker
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Holdings of Metairie, LLC
Represented By: Tyler John Arbour
Represented By: Ryan Michael Tucker
Represented By: Ashley L. Belleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda P. Fischbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?