Carpenter v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shena Carpenter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00328
Filed: February 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Affidavit of Service. **For future filings, please note that summons returned executed is an available event to use and will calculate the answer due date. Your filing should have stated that U.S. Attorney's Office served on 3/1/2021; answer due 4/30/2021, Office of Regional Chief Counsel Social Security Administration served on 3/8/2021; answer due 5/7/2021, and United States Attorney General served on 3/11/2021; answer due 5/10/2021.** (mm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jordan S. Harcleroad of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 3/1/2021; answer due 4/30/2021, Office of Regional Chief Counsel Social Security Administration on 3/8/2021; answer due 5/7/2021, and United States Attorney General on 3/11/2021; answer due 5/10/2021. (Wicklund, Edward) Modified text/answer due date on 3/15/2021 (mm).
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward A Wicklund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/22/2021. (ajn)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/22/2021. (ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2021: #1 Pauper Letter) (ajn).
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
February 14, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8734588) by Shena Carpenter. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text/referral on 2/16/2021 (cwa).
February 14, 2021 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shena Carpenter. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Order)(Misko, Benjamin) Modified text/referral on 2/16/2021 (cwa).
February 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Shena Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)Attorney Benjamin M. Misko added to party Shena Carpenter(pty:pla).(Misko, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shena Carpenter
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?